Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12391

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:24-bk-12397
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
FLX FWD Logistics, LLC
12200 Herbert Wayne Ct
Huntersville, NC 28078-6335
Represented By
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
8 8 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Tue 02/25 12:54 AM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch G, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. /Supplement to Schedule G of FLX FWD Logistics, LLC Filed by FLX FWD Logistics, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
7 7 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 12/16 3:03 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by FLX FWD Logistics, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
6 6 misc Amended Schedules/Statements Wed 12/11 4:16 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by FLX FWD Logistics, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 12/10 1:57 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by FLX FWD Logistics, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 12/10 1:56 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by FLX FWD Logistics, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Fri 10/25 8:42 AM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: American Tire Distributors, Inc., Case No. 24-12391 (CTG); ATD New Holdings II, Inc., Case No. 24-12392 (CTG); ATD New Holdings III, Inc., Case No. 24-12393 (CTG); ATD New Holdings, Inc., Case No. 24-12394 (CTG); ATD Sourcing Solutions, LLC, Case No. 24-12395 (CTG); ATD Technology Solutions Inc., Case No. 24-12396 (CTG); FLX FWD Logistics, LLC, Case No. 24-12397 (CTG); Hercules Tire International Inc., Case No. 24-12398 (CTG); Terrys Tire Town Holdings, LLC, Case No. 24-12399 (CTG); The Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, Case No. 24-12400 (CTG); Tire Pros Francorp, LLC, Case No. 24-12401 (CTG); Tirebuyer.com, LLC, Case No. 24-12402 (CTG); and Torqata Data and Analytics LLC, Case No. 24-12403 (CTG). The docket in Case No. 24-12391 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Related [+] Signed on 10/25/2024 (NAB)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 10/23 8:48 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-12397 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11855071, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 10/23 12:20 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by FLX FWD Logistics, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Wed 10/23 8:23 AM
Judge Craig T Goldblatt added to case (SH)
Related: [-]