Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Timothy W Dore
Case #: 2:24-bk-12661
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Nov 18, 2024

Debtor
West Coast Construction and Design LLC
2201 Thea Ct
Milton, WA 98354-9740
Represented By
Lawrence M Blue
Bountiful Law, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Ronald G. Brown
Ronald G. Brown, Chapter 7 Trustee P.O. Box 2369
Kirkland, WA 98083
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101


Docket last updated: 10/23/2024 12:08 AM PDT
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 10/22 5:07 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition ( 24-12661 [misc,1028] ( 338.00). Receipt number A28554433. Fee amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Creditors Uploaded Tue 10/22 5:31 PM
Creditor matrix uploaded/added 11 creditor(s). (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (OTC) Tue 10/22 5:06 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Non-Individual . Filed by Lawrence M Blue of Bountiful Law, PLLC on behalf of West Coast Construction and Design LLC (Blue, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAWBApi Meeting of Creditors-Business Chapter 7 Asset Tue 10/22 5:10 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Brown, Ronald G. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/18/2024 at 12:00 PM via 341 Zoom Brown: Meeting ID 461 609 6703, Passcode 3660254164, Phone 1-425-332-5845. (Blue, Lawrence)
Related: [-]