Arizona District Court
Judge:Angela M Martinez
Case #: 4:24-cv-00103
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 23, 2024 8:06 PM MST
Defendant
CPS Solutions LLC
Defendant
Genoa Healthcare LLC
Defendant
UHS of Tucson LLC
Defendant
Universal Health Services Incorporated
Movant
United States of America
Represented By
Lon R Leavitt
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Olivia Brown
Represented By
Matthew Modafferi
Frier Levitt LLC
contact info
Jason N Silberberg
Frier Levitt LLC
contact info
Jonathan E Levitt
Frier & Levitt LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 12/18 9:26 AM
ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall docket accordingly and close the file in this matter. Signed by District Judge Angela M Martinez on 12/17/2024. (ARC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action Tue 12/17 7:37 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Olivia Brown. (Modafferi, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/22 10:50 AM
ORDER: The Complaint, the United States of America's Notice of Election to Decline Intervention, and this Order shall be unsealed and served upon Defendants by the relator. All other contents of the Court's file prior to the date of this Order shall remain under seal and shall not be made public or served upon Defendants. The seal shall be lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of all future orders of this Court to the United States. Signed by District Judge Angela M Martinez on 10/21/24. (See attached pdf for complete information.) (KAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
10 10 EX PARTE NOTICE of Election to Decline Intervention by United States of America. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 12, 2024
9 9 ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc1 Ex Parte Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to 31 USC 3730(b)(2). All prior Orders remain in effect. Signed by District Judge Angela M Martinez on 9/11/24. (cc: Jason Silberberg; Jonathan Levitt; Matthew Modafferi; Lon Leavitt) (KAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
7 7 EX PARTE ORDER granting6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Partially Lift and Extend the Seal and Deadline for Election on Intervention. The United States shall have up to and including October 15, 2024, to intervene in the action or to notify the Court it declines to do so. The complaint and all other filings in this case shall remain sealed until October 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 4/11/24. (cc: Jason Silberberg, Jonathan Levitt, Matthew Modafferi, Lon Leavitt) (KAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
6 6 EX PARTE MOTION for Extension of Time to Partially Lift and Extend the Seal and Deadline for Election on Intervention by United States of America.(KAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jason N Silberberg on behalf of Plaintiff Olivia Brown. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew Modafferi on behalf of Plaintiff Olivia Brown. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
5 5 Filing fee PAID IN FULL. (KAH)
Related: [-]
4 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 400001587. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott H Rash. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-103-TUC-SHR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (cc: Plaintiff's Counsel) (KAH)
Related: [-]
3 3 COMPLAINT filed by Olivia Brown.(KAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope
2 2 NOTICE of Relator's Ex Parte Motion to File Under Seal by Olivia Brown. (KAH)
Related: [-]
1 1 EX PARTE MOTION to File Under Seal Pursuant to 31 USC 3730(b)(2) by Olivia Brown.(KAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order