Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:24-cr-60207
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 23, 2024 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Kristoffer Woodward (1)
Represented By
Jason Wyatt Kreiss
Jason W. Kreiss
contact info
Sarah Klein Maya
The Kreiss Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph A. Cooley
Doj-Usao
contact info
Vanessa E. Bonhomme
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/23/2024 4:48 AM EDT
Sunday, April 14, 2024
Arrest of Kristoffer Woodward (smy) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Kristoffer Woodward (1). (smy) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
Set Hearing as to Kristoffer Woodward: Initial Appearance set for 4/15/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (smy) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Initial Appearance as to Kristoffer Woodward held on 4/15/2024.. Arraignment set for 4/29/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 4/18/2024 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 4/29/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 4/18/2024 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (Digital 11:41:11/11:43:16/11:51:28) Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/15/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORE TENUS MOTION for Pretrial Detention Hearing by USA as to Kristoffer Woodward. (smy) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 3 ORE TENUS Motion for Pretrial Detention Hearing. as to Kristoffer Woodward (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/15/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORE TENUS MOTION to Continue Report Re: Counsel by Kristoffer Woodward. (smy) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
6 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 5 ORE TENUS Motion to Continue Report Re: Counsel as to Kristoffer Woodward (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/15/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
7 7 NOTICE of Reassignment of Assistant US Attorney. Vanessa E. Bonhomme appearing for USA. Joseph A. Cooley terminated. Attorney Vanessa E. Bonhomme added to party USA(pty:pla). (Bonhomme, Vanessa) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sarah Klein Maya appearing for Kristoffer Woodward (Maya, Sarah) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
9 9 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Report Re: Counsel Hearing as to Kristoffer Woodward held on 4/18/2024, Detention Hearing as to Kristoffer Woodward not held on 4/18/2024. Stipulated bond set: Kristoffer Woodward (1) $200,000 PSB., Defense waives speedy trial. ( Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 5/15/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge.). Attorney added: Jason Wyatt Kreiss for Kristoffer Woodward (Digital 10:35:36) Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/18/2024. (smy) Modified text on 4/18/2024 (smy). [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jason Wyatt Kreiss appearing for Kristoffer Woodward (smy) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
11 11 $200,000 PSB Bond Entered as to Kristoffer Woodward Approved by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (smy) (smy). [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/18/2024) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
12 12 ORE TENUS MOTION to Continue Report Re: Counsel by Defense as to Kristoffer Woodward. (smy) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
13 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 12 ORE TENUS Motion to Continue Report Re: Counsel as to Kristoffer Woodward (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/18/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORAL MOTION to Continue Arraignment by Defense as to Kristoffer Woodward. (smy) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
15 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 14 ORE TENUS Motion to Continue Arraignment as to Kristoffer Woodward (1). Arraignment set for 5/15/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 5/15/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/18/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
16 16 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Prelim Examination/ Arraignment/ Report re: Counsel by Kristoffer Woodward. Responses due by 5/23/2024.(Maya, Sarah) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order
Friday, May 10, 2024
17 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting16 Motion to Continue Prelim Examination/ Arraignment/ Report re: Counsel as to Kristoffer Woodward (1). For the reasons stated in the Motion, the undersigned finds that the ends of justice served by granting the Motion outweigh the interest of the public and the Defendant in a speedy trial. Accordingly, the Court finds that the period between May 10,2024 through and including July 22, 2024, shall be deemed excludable in accordance with the provisions of the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. § 3161, et seq.. Arraignment set for 7/22/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 7/22/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 7/22/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 5/10/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
18 18 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Prelim Examination/ Arraignment/ Report re: Counsel by Kristoffer Woodward. Responses due by 7/24/2024.(Maya, Sarah) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
19 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting18 Motion to Continue Prelim Examination/ Arraignment/ Report re: Counsel as to Kristoffer Woodward (1). For the reasons stated in the Motion, the undersigned finds that the ends of justice served by granting the Motion outweigh the interest of the public and the Defendant in a speedy trial. Accordingly, the Court finds that the period between 7/22/2024 through and including 9/5/2024, shall be deemed excludable in accordance with the provisions of the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. § 3161, et seq.. Arraignment set for 9/5/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 9/5/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 9/5/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 7/10/2024. (rbe) Modified on 7/11/2024 (rbe). [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
20 20 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Prelim Examination/ Arraignment/ Report re: Counsel by Kristoffer Woodward. Responses due by 9/11/2024.(Maya, Sarah) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order
21 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting20 Unopposed Motion to Continue Preliminary Examination/ Arraignment/ Report re: Counsel as to Kristoffer Woodward (1). The Preliminary Examination/ Arraignment/ Report re: Counsel scheduled for September 5, 2024 is CANCELLED and is RESCHEDULED to October 15,2024. Moreover, for the reasons stated in the Motion, the undersigned finds that the ends of justice served by granting the Motion outweigh the interest of the public and the Defendant in a speedy trial. Accordingly, the Court finds that the period between August 28,2024 through and including October 15, 2024, shall be deemed excludable in accordance with the provisions of the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. § 3161, et seq.. Arraignment set for 10/15/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 10/15/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 10/15/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 8/28/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
22 22 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Prelim Examination/ Arraignment/ Report re: Counsel by Kristoffer Woodward. Responses due by 10/25/2024.(Maya, Sarah) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
23 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting22 Unopposed Motion to Continue Preliminary Examination/ Arraignment/ Report re: Counsel as to Kristoffer Woodward (1). The Preliminary Examination/ Arraignment/ Report re: Counsel scheduled for October 15,2024 is CANCELLED and is RESCHEDULED to October 22,2024. Moreover, for the reasons stated in the Motion, the undersigned finds that the ends of justice served by granting the Motion outweigh the interest of the public and the Defendant in a speedy trial. Accordingly, the Court finds that the period between October 11,2024 through and including October 22,2024, shall be deemed excludable in accordance with the provisions of the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. § 3161, et seq.. Arraignment set for 10/22/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 10/22/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 10/22/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 10/11/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
24 24 Unopposed MOTION Motion to Waive Defendant's Appearance at Arraignment by Kristoffer Woodward. Responses due by 10/30/2024. (Maya, Sarah) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
25 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting24 Motion to waive of appearance as to Kristoffer Woodward (1). Defendant need not appear at the hearing set for October 22, 2024. However, Defendant shall execute and file a written waiver (signed by both Defendant and his counsel) at or prior to the October 22, 2024 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 10/16/2024. (JMS) [0:24-mj-06160-PMH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
26 26 INFORMATION as to Kristoffer Woodward (1) count(s) 1. FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS. (at)
Related: [-]
27 27 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jason Wyatt Kreiss appearing for Kristoffer Woodward (Kreiss, Jason)
Related: [-]
28 28 WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by Kristoffer Woodward (Kreiss, Jason)
Related: [-]
29 29 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Kristoffer Woodward (at)
Related: [-]
30 30 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss: Report Re Counsel Hearing as to Kristoffer Woodward held on 10/22/2024., ARRAIGNMENT as to Kristoffer Woodward (1) Count 1 held on 10/22/2024 Defendant not present in court. Jason Kreiss filed permanent appearance [ECF 27] for trial only. A Waiver of appearance at Arraignment was filed [ECF NO.28] Waiver of Indictment filed. Court informed both parties of Rule 10(b) charged by way of an Indictment or Misdemeanor Information. (Digital 11:00:59-11:14:43) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. PAPERLESS STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER: The defendant(s) having been arraigned this date in open Court, it is Ordered that within 14 days of the date of this order that all parties to this action shall review and comply with Southern District of Florida Local Rules 88.10 (Criminal Discovery), and 88.9(c) (Motions in Criminal Cases). Upon a sufficient showing, the Court may at any time, upon a properly filed motion, order that the discovery or inspection provided for by this Standing Order be denied, restricted or deferred, or make such other order as is appropriate. It is expected by the Court, however, that counsel for both sides shall make a good faith effort to comply with the letter and spirit of this Standing Order. It shall be the continuing duty of counsel for both sides to immediately reveal to opposing counsel all newly discovered information or other material within the scope of Local Rule 88.10. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 10/22/2024). (at)
Related: [-]