Connecticut District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-00851
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 23, 2024 3:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Canyon Beasley (1)
Represented By
Carly Levenson
Federal Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher Lembo
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/23/2024 4:50 AM EDT
Monday, September 23, 2024
Set Deadline as to Canyon Beasley: Unseal Deadline due by 10/23/2024 (Langello, N)
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Canyon Beasley (1). (Langello, N)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 SEALED MOTION To Seal by USA as to Canyon Beasley. (Langello, N)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Sealed Motion as to Canyon Beasley (1). Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 9/23/2024. (Langello, N)
Related: [-]