California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward J Davila
Referred: Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:24-cv-07374
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 3:07 AM PDT
Defendant
LinkedIn Corporation
Represented By
Robyn Pariser
Keker Van Nest & Peters
contact info
Matan Shacham
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Jonhatan Aragon
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Benjamin Berkowitz
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Christina Lee
Keker Van Nest And Peters LLP
contact info
Spencer McManus
Keker Van Nest & Peters
contact info
Maxwell Evan Alderman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By
Abigail Augus Barrera
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Kristin I Sheffield-Whitehead
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie Marilyn Blunschi
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Catherine Anne Rizzoni
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Spring Fertility Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Timothy K. Branson
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Sara Anderson Frey
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Plaintiff
J.S.
Represented By
Sarah Nicole Westcot
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
62 62 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Wed 03/12 9:56 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed bySpring Fertility Holdings, LLC. (Frey, Sara)
Related: [-] 45 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Points and Authorities
61 61 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Wed 03/12 3:59 PM
REPLY in Support Related [+] filed byLinkedIn Corporation. (Lee, Christina) Modified on 3/12/2025 (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 41 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support