New Jersey District Court
Judge:Edward S Kiel
Referred: Sharon A King
Case #: 1:24-cv-09961
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By
SEAN MICHAEL O'BRIEN
Lippes Mathias LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL CIRELLI
Represented By
YITZCHAK ZELMAN
Marcus Zelman, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Terminated: 11/13/2024


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
20 20 order Order Mon 04/28 1:09 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone status conference on April 28, 2025; it is hereby ORDERED that a follow-up telephone status conference is scheduled for July 2, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID: 130 303 261#. The deadlines set forth in the January 7, 2025 Scheduling Order [ECF No. 14] remain in effect. Fact discovery expires on July 7, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 4/28/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 04/28 1:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/28/2025. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
19 19 order Order Mon 03/03 1:39 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone status conference on March 3, 2025; it is hereby ORDERED that a follow-up telephone status conference is scheduled for April 28, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID: 323 890 002#. The deadlines set forth in the January 7, 2025 Scheduling Order [ECF No. 14] remain in effect. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 3/3/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 03/03 1:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/3/2025. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
18 18 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Tue 02/18 12:10 PM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 2/18/2025. (kes, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
17 17 misc Letter Mon 02/17 3:28 PM
Letter from Defendant submitted Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order.(O'BRIEN, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/22 4:15 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael K. Chapman, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 01/22/2025. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/17 3:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC..(O'BRIEN, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Sean M. O'Brien,
Att: 2 Affidavit Michael K. Chapman,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/17 4:17 PM
Set Deadlines as to15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 2/18/2025 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
14 14 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/07 3:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 3/3/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Counsel shall dial 1-856-210-8988, Conference ID 538 060 962# to connect to the call. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2025. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 7/7/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 10/8/2025 If expert discovery will be served, or by 9/8/2025 If expert discovery will not be served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/07/2025. (kes, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 01/07 2:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/7/2025. Scheduling Order to be entered. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
13 13 discov Joint Discovery Plan Fri 01/03 3:29 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by MICHAEL CIRELLI.(ZELMAN, YITZCHAK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
12 12 order Order Thu 01/02 10:21 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall submit a Joint Discovery Plan to the Court no later than the time period provided for in L.Civ.R. 26.1(b)(2). The form to be used for the Joint Discovery Plan can be retrieved from: http://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/R16DiscoveryPlanCamONLY.pdf. The plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/2/25. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
11 11 order Order Thu 12/12 9:45 AM
TEXT ORDER:The initial scheduling conference on January 7, 2024 at 10:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-856-210-8988 conference ID: 381 164 641# Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 12/12/24. (mb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
10 10 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Tue 12/10 9:00 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 1/7/2025 at 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 12/10/2024. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/09 10:05 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC..(O'BRIEN, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 11/26 9:24 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The7 Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC. on 11/25/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/9/2024. (mag)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/25 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN MICHAEL O'BRIEN on behalf of INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC. (O'BRIEN, SEAN)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 11/25 3:00 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant International Recovery System, Inc.'s time to respond to the Complaint.. (O'BRIEN, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/14 2:30 PM
ORDER Granting Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 11/14/2024. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Wed 11/13 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation by MICHAEL CIRELLI (ZELMAN, YITZCHAK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/05 3:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL CIRELLI. INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC. served on 11/4/2024, answer due 11/25/2024. (ZELMAN, YITZCHAK)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/05 2:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL CIRELLI. BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION served on 11/4/2024, answer due 11/25/2024. (ZELMAN, YITZCHAK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 10/24 9:41 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mag)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Thu 10/24 9:39 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption, Party Information: Alias information should be added as an "alias", not to be included in a party's name . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (mag)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Thu 10/24 9:40 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (mag)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT against BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS, INC. a/k/a INTERNATIONAL RECOVERY SYSTEMS OF PA, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15751457) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHAEL CIRELLI.(ZELMAN, YITZCHAK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 10/23 2:17 PM
Judge Edward S. Kiel and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw)
Related: [-]