California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:24-cv-07375
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Terminated:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 1:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Nancy Abella
Represented By
Ernesto H Molina, Jr
Doj-Civ
contact info
Bichngoc T. Do
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Antony J. Blinken
Represented By
Ernesto H Molina, Jr
Doj-Civ
contact info
Bichngoc T. Do
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
John Does #1-10
Represented By
Bichngoc T. Do
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
Masoumeh Azimi
Represented By
Jennifer Nimer
Nimer Law LLC
contact info
Paris E Scott
Pars Equality Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Mahsa Tajdari
Represented By
Jennifer Nimer
Nimer Law LLC
contact info
Paris E Scott
Pars Equality Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Mehdi Tajdari
Represented By
Jennifer Nimer
Nimer Law LLC
contact info
Paris E Scott
Pars Equality Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 06, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 02/06 7:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mahsa Tajdari, Mehdi Tajdari, Masoumeh Azimi (Nimer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 01/23 10:17 AM
ORDER Granting 17 Extension Request. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on January 23, 2025. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
17 17 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 01/22 10:27 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Antony J. Blinken, Nancy Abella, John Does #1-10.(Do, Bichngoc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 12/20 3:58 PM
ORDER Granting 15 Extension Request. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on December 20, 2024. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 12/20 7:21 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Antony J. Blinken, Nancy Abella, John Does #1-10.(Do, Bichngoc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 22, 2024
14 14 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 11/22 10:53 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Antony J. Blinken, Nancy Abella, John Does #1-10.. (Do, Bichngoc)
Related: [-]
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 11/22 9:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 11/21 6:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Bichngoc T. Do on behalf of Antony J. Blinken, Nancy Abella, John Does #1-10 (Do, Bichngoc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 11/12 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Ernesto H Molina, Jr on behalf of Antony J. Blinken, Nancy Abella (Molina, Ernesto)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 11/07 3:34 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mahsa Tajdari, Mehdi Tajdari, Masoumeh Azimi.. (Nimer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 11/07 9:41 AM
2ND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 11/21/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 10/28 12:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mahsa Tajdari, Masoumeh Azimi, Mehdi Tajdari. Nancy Abella served on 10/25/2024, answer due 12/24/2024; Antony J. Blinken served on 10/25/2024, answer due 12/24/2024; John Does #1-10 served on 10/25/2024, answer due 12/24/2024. (Nimer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/24 4:32 PM
ORDER Granting 4 Application of Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. The Court cautions counsel that, under Civil Local Rule 11-3, she "is not eligible for permission to practice pro hac vice if [she is]... regularly engaged in the practice of law in the State of California." Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on October 24, 2024. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 10/23 6:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Nancy Abella, Antony J. Blinken, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Wed 10/23 6:03 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/23 5:13 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19980987.) filed by Masoumeh Azimi, Mahsa Tajdari, Mehdi Tajdari.(Nimer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 10/23 8:46 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/6/2024. (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 10/23 8:13 AM
Proposed Summons. (Scott, Paris)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Wed 10/23 8:10 AM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19977441). Filed by Mahsa Tajdari, Masoumeh Azimi, Mehdi Tajdari.(Scott, Paris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet