New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Case #: 1:24-cv-08055
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Dani Adelstein
Represented By
Douglas Joseph Klein
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Bryn Goodman
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Timothy Gumaer
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Annabel Rae Stanley
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Robert Russini
Represented By
Douglas Joseph Klein
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Annabel Rae Stanley
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Phil Stein
Defendant
New Start Capital LLC
Represented By
Douglas Joseph Klein
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Annabel Rae Stanley
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alana Lambert
Represented By
Chaya Mushke Gourarie
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info
Jennifer Calamia
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimarah LeRouge
Represented By
Chaya Mushke Gourarie
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info
Jennifer Calamia
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Erica Wiltz
Represented By
Chaya Mushke Gourarie
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info
Jennifer Calamia
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Omnaya Abouzaid
Represented By
Chaya Mushke Gourarie
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info
Jennifer Calamia
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
95 95 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/05 3:25 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:74 MOTION to Amend/Correct file Second Amended Complaint . and Cross-Motion to Compel Arbitration . Document filed by Dani Adelstein, New Start Capital LLC, Robert Russini..(Goodman, Bryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
94 94 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Sat 05/03 12:00 AM
DECLARATION of Bryn Goodman in Support re:92 CROSS MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Dani Adelstein, New Start Capital LLC, Robert Russini..(Goodman, Bryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4: Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5: Transcript of January 8, 2025 Telephone Conference,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6: Plaintiffs' Arbitration Agreements
93 93 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/02 11:56 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:74 MOTION to Amend/Correct file Second Amended Complaint . and Cross Motion to Compel Arbitration . Document filed by Dani Adelstein, New Start Capital LLC, Robert Russini..(Goodman, Bryn)
Related: [-]
92 92 motion Compel Arbitration Fri 05/02 11:36 PM
CROSS MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint . Document filed by Dani Adelstein, New Start Capital LLC, Robert Russini..(Goodman, Bryn)
Related: [-]