Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-30229

Illinois Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Laura K Grandy
Case #: 3:24-ap-03026
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Terminated:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Small Business Financial Solutions LLC d/b/a Rapid Finance
4500 East West Hwy 6th Floor
Bethesda, MD 20814
Represented By
Small Business Financial Solutions LLC d/b/a Rapid Finance
contact info
Plaintiff
Russell C Simon
Chapter 13 Trustee 19 Bronze Pointe Suite A
Swansea, IL 62226
Represented By
Russell C Simon
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Friday, December 13, 2024
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/13 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
22 22 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 12/11 9:42 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (js)
Related: [-] 21
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
21 21 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 12/10 2:45 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Russell C Simon (Simon, Russell)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 08, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/08 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/08 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Minutes of Court
Friday, December 06, 2024
18 18 misc Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 12/06 2:45 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Small Business Financial Solutions LLC. (Darcy, D)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 12/06 2:41 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Small Business Financial Solutions LLC. (Woolley, Charles)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Fri 12/06 9:50 AM
Order Related [+]. (js)
Related: [-] 13 Vacating Clerk's Entry of Default
Thursday, December 05, 2024
15 15 order Minutes of Court Thu 12/05 4:44 PM
Minutes of Court - Continuing Status Hearing Related [+]. Status Hearing before Judge Mary P. Gorman scheduled for 1/9/2025 at 03:00 PM viz ZOOM. (js)
Related: [-] 1 Regarding Complaint filed by Plaintiff Russell C Simon,13 Vacating Clerk's Entry of Default
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 12/04 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Clerk's Entry of Default
Monday, December 02, 2024
13 13 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 12/02 10:21 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Small Business Financial Solutions LLC d/b/a Rapid Finance Related [+]. (js)
Related: [-] 11 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Russell C Simon
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/27 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Notice
11 11 misc Request for Entry of Default Wed 11/27 10:35 AM
Request by Plaintiff(s) for Entry of Default Filed by Plaintiff Russell C Simon. (Simon, Russell)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Affidavit Wed 11/27 10:34 AM
Affidavit Re: Default Filed by Plaintiff Russell C Simon Related [+]. (Simon, Russell)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Russell C Simon
9 9 motion Default Judgment Wed 11/27 10:33 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Russell C Simon (Simon, Russell)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Default Entitlement
Monday, November 25, 2024
8 8 court Notice Mon 11/25 8:51 AM
Status Hearing Regarding Related [+] Hearing before Judge Mary P. Gorman scheduled for 12/5/2024 at 03:00 PM via ZOOM. (hm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Russell C Simon
Sunday, November 24, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/24 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Default Entitlement
Friday, November 22, 2024
6 6 court Notice of Default Entitlement Fri 11/22 8:34 AM
Notice of Default Entitlement. Deadline to File Motion for Default Judgment: 12/13/2024. (js)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 03, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/03 10:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Reassigning Case
Friday, November 01, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 11/01 8:20 AM
Order Reassigning Case Judge Mary P. Gorman added to case. Involvement of Judge Laura K. Grandy Terminated (hm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Mon 10/28 2:12 PM
Receipt Number 30000345, Fee Amount $350.00 Related [+]. (tf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Russell C Simon
Thursday, October 24, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 10/24 2:42 PM
Summons Service Executed on Small Business Financial Solutions LLC d/b/a Rapid Finance 10/24/2024 .. (Simon, Russell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 10/22 1:26 PM
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/22 1:26 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint to Avoid Transfer by Russell C Simon against Small Business Financial Solutions LLC d/b/a Rapid Finance. (Simon, Russell)
Related: [-]