Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01049
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Telecity, LLC
Represented By
Telecity, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 03/10 3:44 PM
Order Granting Motion to Continue Adversary Proceedings Trial Docket Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 3/10/25 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 8/20/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 3 Order,8 Motion to Continue Trial filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Friday, March 07, 2025
8 8 motion Continue Trial (Motion) (AP) Fri 03/07 10:53 AM
Motion to Continue Trial on Litigation Trustee's Unopposed Motion to Reset Trial Docket Call Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)3 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint (AP) Tue 01/07 8:28 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Telecity, LLC (DeTrinis, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 4:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Fri 11/08 2:41 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)3 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Friday, October 25, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/25 3:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on Telecity, LLC 10/25/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 10/24 4:58 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 10/24/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Wed 10/23 11:52 AM
Summons Issued on Telecity, LLC Answer Due 11/22/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/22 2:42 PM
Adversary case 24-01049 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Fraudulent and/or Preferential Transfers by Dwayne M. Murray against Telecity, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover sheet