Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-32661

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kesha L Tanabe
Case #: 3:24-ap-03128
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
400 MARYLAND AVE SW
WASHINGTON, DC 20202
Plaintiff
Sean Michael Brenden
20582 Keystone Ave.
Lakeville, MN 55044
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Butwinick
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:08 PM CDT
Saturday, April 05, 2025
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/05 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/05/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
20 20 4 pgs order Order for trial Thu 04/03 8:59 AM
Order for trial. Motions Due: 7/15/2025. Discovery due by 6/16/2025. Trial date set for 8/20/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 7 West, 7th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge William J. Fisher. (AVP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 04/02 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
18 18 audio PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Tue 04/01 9:01 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [03/31/2025 11:00:00 AM]. File Size [ 1008 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:27 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order for scheduling conference Mon 03/31 10:26 AM
FILED IN ERROR Order for scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/15/2025 at 02:30 PM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). (AVP)Modified on 3/31/2025 (AVP)
Related: [-]
court CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Mon 03/31 11:06 AM
Minutes re:12 Order for scheduling conference. Appearances by Jeffrey Butwinick for the Plaintiff and Bahram Samie for the Defendant. Based on the record, discovery due June 15, 2025; motions to be heard by July 15, 2025; trial to be held in August 2025. (RAG)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to complaint Fri 03/28 3:41 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Hoskins, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 02/13 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 02/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 02/10 5:29 PM
Order for no further extensions Related [+] (DH)
Related: [-] 10 Order Extending Deadline to Answer or Respond
Sunday, February 09, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 02/09 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 02/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order for scheduling conference Fri 02/07 10:03 AM
Order for scheduling conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/31/2025 at 11:00 AM. Location: *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). (DH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
court Public entry Wed 02/05 1:03 PM
Although not necessary, Judge Fisher certifies familiarity with the record and determines that the case may be completed without prejudice to the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 63, made applicable by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9028. (DH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
court Case Reassigned - Judge Tue 02/04 12:53 PM
Judge William J Fisher added to case. Involvement of Judge Kesha L Tanabe terminated. (AVP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 01/29 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 01/29/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 01/27 2:47 PM
Order Extending Deadline to Answer or Respond to March 28, 2025 Re: Related [+] (AVP)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation
9 9 misc Stipulation or Agreement Mon 01/27 8:30 AM
Stipulation filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and Sean Michael Brenden. Proposed Order. Nature of stipulation: Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.(Hoskins, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Thursday, November 28, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 11/28 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 11/26 2:27 PM
Order Extending Deadline to Answer or Respond to January 27, 2025 Re: Related [+] (AVP)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation
6 6 misc Stipulation or Agreement Tue 11/26 1:39 PM
Stipulation filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and Sean Michael Brenden. Proposed Order. Nature of stipulation: Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond.(Hoskins, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of appearance and request for notice Wed 10/30 8:30 AM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and Adam Hoskins. (Hoskins, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of service Tue 10/29 1:40 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Sean Michael Brenden.(Butwinick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Thursday, October 24, 2024
3 3 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Thu 10/24 2:07 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor filed by Sean Michael Brenden. (Butwinick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
2 2 court Summons for adversary proceeding Wed 10/23 1:26 PM
Summons issued on UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION Date Issued 10/23/2024, Answer Due 11/27/2024 (AVP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/23 11:57 AM
Adversary case 24-03128 (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Sean Michael Brenden against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. No Fee. (Butwinick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]