New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:24-cv-08058
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12112 Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Helen Hayes Hospital
Represented By
Rosemary Bernadette Boller
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheona Antonello
Represented By
Jordan Alexander El-Hag
El-Hag And Associates, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Helen Hayes Hospital Foundation Inc.
Terminated: 11/21/2024
Represented By
Christina Saccocio Parker
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Yvonne Evans
Terminated: 11/21/2024
Represented By
Christina Saccocio Parker
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 02/19 3:29 PM
ORDER: As discussed at the court conference this morning, on consent of all parties, the federal claims are dismissed with prejudice and the state claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 2/19/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
minutes Pre-Motion Conference Thu 02/20 11:23 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Pre-Motion Conference held on 2/19/2025. Plaintiff's counsel Jordan El-Hag, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendant's counsel(s) Christina Parker, Esq. and Rosemary Boller, Esq. appear telephonically. Law Clerk Samantha Mitchell appears telephonically. As per the consent of the parties, the Court is dismissing the federal claims in this case with prejudice, and the state claims will be dismissed without prejudice. The Court will issue a written Order. This proceeding was recorded via the Cisco Webex platform. (wc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rosemary Bernadette Boller on behalf of Helen Hayes Hospital..(Boller, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Mon 02/17 7:45 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jordan El-Hag dated 02/17/2025 re: pre motion letter. Document filed by Sheona Antonello..(El-Hag, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
15 15 order Order Tue 01/21 4:24 PM
ORDER re:14 Letter filed by Helen Hayes Hospital: Telephonic pre-motion conference to be held on 2/19/25 at 10:45 am. Call-in number is 855-244-8681 and access code is 1809850784#. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's letter, by letter of no more than 3 pages, no later than 2/12/25. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel) (Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Tue 01/21 3:27 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Christina Parker dated January 21, 2025 re: Pre-Motion Conference Letter. Document filed by Helen Hayes Hospital..(Parker, Christina)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/22 1:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Helen Hayes Hospital waiver sent on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. Document filed by Sheona Antonello..(El-Hag, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
12 12 service Summons Issued Thu 11/21 3:50 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Helen Hayes Hospital. (sj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 11/20 9:53 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Helen Hayes Hospital, re:9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Sheona Antonello..(El-Hag, Jordan)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 11/20 9:49 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(El-Hag, Jordan)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/20 9:48 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Helen Hayes Hospital with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sheona Antonello. Related document:1 Complaint,..(El-Hag, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6
Friday, November 15, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 11/15 9:34 AM
ORDER granting7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Both Defendants may have until 1/6/25 to respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/15 8:42 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Christina Parker dated November 15, 2024. Document filed by Helen Hayes Hospital Foundation Inc., Yvonne Evans..(Parker, Christina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/05 1:57 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Helen Hayes Hospital Foundation Inc. served on 10/30/2024, answer due 11/20/2024. Service was accepted by Secretary of Service. Document filed by Sheona Antonello..(El-Hag, Jordan)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/05 1:54 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Yvonne Evans served on 10/31/2024, answer due 11/21/2024. Service was accepted by Yvonne Evans. Document filed by Sheona Antonello..(El-Hag, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 10/24 1:02 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Helen Hayes Hospital Foundation Inc., Yvonne Evans..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 10/24 10:39 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 10/24 10:40 AM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 10/24 10:41 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 10/24 10:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ivonne Evans. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ivonne Evans. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 10/24 10:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jordan Alexander El-Hag. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Rockland;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 10/23 3:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(El-Hag, Jordan)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/23 3:07 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Helen Hayes Hospital Foundation Inc. and Yvonne Evans, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sheona Antonello..(El-Hag, Jordan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/23 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Ivonne Evans, Helen Hayes Hospital Foundation Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30083505)Document filed by Sheona Antonello..(El-Hag, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit _1,
Att: 2 Exhibit _2,
Att: 3 Exhibit _3,
Att: 4 Exhibit _4,
Att: 5 Exhibit _5,
Att: 6 Exhibit _6