Colorado District Court
Judge:Daniel D Domenico
Referred: Scott T Varholak
Case #: 1:24-cv-02943
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Case in other court:Arapahoe County District Court, 2024CV31968
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 2:16 AM MDT
Defendant
USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Kelly L. Kafer
Rider Kafer PC
contact info
Jeremy Robert Speckhals
Rider Kafer PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hilary Vanderveen
Represented By
Jeremy Andrew Sitcoff
Levin Sitcoff PC
contact info
Jonathan Shawn Sar
Parker Lipman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Theodore Vanderveen
Represented By
Jeremy Andrew Sitcoff
Levin Sitcoff PC
contact info
Jonathan Shawn Sar
Parker Lipman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 04/22 11:44 AM
ORDER granting20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court extends the deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants written discovery to 5/5/2025. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/22/2025. Text Only Entry(stvlc6, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
21 21 order Order Referring Motion Mon 04/21 3:31 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's First Set of Written Discovery filed by Hilary Vanderveen, Theodore Vanderveen.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/21/2025. Text Only Entry (dddlc10)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/21 10:47 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's First Set of Written Discovery by Plaintiffs Theodore Vanderveen, Hilary Vanderveen. (Sitcoff, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
19 19 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time Fri 03/28 3:26 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's First Set of Written Discovery by Plaintiffs Theodore Vanderveen, Hilary Vanderveen. (Sitcoff, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 03/07 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of Theodore Vanderveen, Hilary VanderveenAttorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Theodore Vanderveen(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Hilary Vanderveen(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/11 11:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/11/2024. (schap, )
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 12/11 9:38 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/11/2024. Discovery due by 8/29/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 9/29/2025. The Scheduling Order is signed and entered on December 11, 2024. FTR: A402. (schap, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 12/04 2:41 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Speckhals, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
14 14 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Tue 12/03 3:09 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Speckhals, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/06 1:02 PM
ANSWER to4 Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Speckhals, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 10/24 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeremy Andrew Sitcoff on behalf of Hilary Vanderveen, Theodore VanderveenAttorney Jeremy Andrew Sitcoff added to party Hilary Vanderveen(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy Andrew Sitcoff added to party Theodore Vanderveen(pty:pla) (Sitcoff, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/23 4:18 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Speckhals, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/23 3:33 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/23/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/4/2024 . Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 10/23 2:22 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/23/2024. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Wed 10/23 1:59 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (agryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 10/23 1:58 PM
Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs misc Order - State Court Wed 10/23 1:58 PM
STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Arapahoe County District Court Judge Benjamin T. Figa. (agryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Wed 10/23 1:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil (CV) Case Cover Sheet for Initial Pleading of Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-claim or Third-party Complaint, Delay Reduction Order (For Cases Filed on or After July 1, 2015), Division 15 Delay Reduction and Order Regarding Plan for Settlement upon USAA Casualty Insurance Company on 09/25/2024 (agryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Wed 10/23 1:53 PM
COMPLAINT against USAA Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Theodore Vanderveen, Hilary Vanderveen.(agryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Removal: Administrative Notices Wed 10/23 1:52 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (agryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Wed 10/23 1:52 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (agryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 10/23 1:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA Casualty Insurance Company from District Court, Arapahoe County, State of Colorado, Case Number 2024CV31968. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9947019), filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Kafer, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Exhibit H,
Att: 11 Exhibit I,
Att: 12 Exhibit J,
Att: 13 Exhibit K,
Att: 14 Exhibit L,
Att: 15 Exhibit M,
Att: 16 Exhibit N,
Att: 17 Exhibit O