California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dena M Coggins
Referred: Allison Claire
Case #: 2:24-cv-02923
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Terminated:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 1:16 AM PDT
Defendant
John Valender
Plaintiff
Quoc H. Nguyen
6231 63rd Street
Sacramento, CA 95824

GPO Oct 30 2024
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/30/2024 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and RECOMMENDING that all claims against all defendants should be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge Dena Coggins. Objections due within 21 days after being served with the Findings and Recommendations. (Woodson, A)
GPO Dec 05 2024
ORDER signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 12/4/2024 ADOPTING the 3 Findings and Recommendations; and DISMISSING this action, without leave to amend, due to Plaintiff's failure to state a cognizable claim for relief. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R.)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, December 05, 2024
7 7 order Judgment Thu 12/05 11:28 AM
JUDGMENT dated *12/5/2024* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 12/4/2024. (Becknal, R.)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations Thu 12/05 11:26 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 12/4/2024 ADOPTING the3 Findings and Recommendations; and DISMISSING this action, without leave to amend, due to Plaintiff's failure to state a cognizable claim for relief. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R.)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 12/05 11:29 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:6 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and7 Judgment served on Quoc H. Nguyen. (Becknal, R.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/12 8:49 AM
NOTICE by Quoc H. Nguyen re defendant John Valender. (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/05 8:09 AM
NOTICE re Accusal by Quoc H. Nguyen (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
3 3 motion Findings and Recommendations Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/30 10:53 AM
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/30/2024 GRANTING2 Motion to Proceed IFP and RECOMMENDING that all claims against all defendants should be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge Dena Coggins. Objections due within 21 days after being served with the Findings and Recommendations. (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Wed 10/30 10:54 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order served on Quoc H. Nguyen. (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/23 12:30 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Quoc H. Nguyen. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/23 12:29 PM
COMPLAINT against John Valender by Quoc H. Nguyen. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc IFP Application Wed 10/23 12:33 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]