California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:24-cv-09128
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Terminated:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Robert Edwin Heffron
Defendant
Super Auto Stop Inc.
Represented By
David E Karlin
Karlin Law Firm LLP
contact info
L Scott Karlin
Karlin Law Firm LLP
contact info
Michael Joseph Karlin
Karlin Law Firm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Edmond Neal
Represented By
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, February 07, 2025
17 17 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 02/07 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Edmond Neal. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 01/08 10:24 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Edmond Neal, upon Defendant Robert Edwin Heffron served on 12/30/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ROBERT EDWIN HEFFRON, DEFENDANT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
15 15 order Dismissing Case Fri 01/03 1:07 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, Re: Notice of Settlement14 . (Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Settlement Fri 01/03 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Edmond Neal. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
13 13 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 12/02 10:42 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Stipulation12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 11/27 12:54 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Super Auto Stop Inc. answer now due 12/27/2024, filed by Attorney for Defendant Super Auto Stop Inc..(Attorney Michael Joseph Karlin added to party Super Auto Stop Inc.(pty:dft))(Karlin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 11/12 1:22 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Edmond Neal, upon Defendant Super Auto Stop Inc. served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon SUARAM ZEYTOUNIAN, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 11/07 10:18 AM
STANDING ORDER RE: DISABILITY CASES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 11/05 11:57 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 10/23 4:56 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Robert Edwin Heffron, Super Auto Stop Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 10/23 4:51 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 10/23 4:50 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 10/23 4:50 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 10/23 1:19 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Edmond Neal. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 10/23 1:19 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 10/23 1:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Edmond Neal. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 10/23 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38451804 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Edmond Neal(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]