California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:24-cv-09130
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Terminated:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Kartek Automotive, Inc.
Defendant
Lasky Properties LLC
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Ignacio Vera
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 23, 2024
18 18 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 12/23 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
17 17 order Staying Case ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/16 11:59 AM
ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On 12/16/2024, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement (Doc.16 ), indicating that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed and that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 1/16/2025. Until the Dismissal Date, the Court retains full jurisdiction over this action. All other deadlines and hearings are vacated. (jp)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Settlement Mon 12/16 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 12/09 2:19 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than 12/16/2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 12/04 2:58 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera, upon Defendant Lasky Properties LLC served on 11/12/2024, answer due 12/3/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Morton Lasky - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 11/21 5:33 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING Supplemental Jurisdiction and DISMISSING State-Law Claims Without Prejudice by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim and other state-law claims in this action, and the claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to filing in state court. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
12 12 misc Response Fri 11/15 11:15 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ignacio Verato Order to Show Cause,11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Thursday, November 07, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 11/07 5:41 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Re Supplemental Jurisdiction by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, in writing, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim and other state-law claims. Failure to respond may, without further warning, result in dismissal of the entire action without prejudice. (jp)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 26, 2024
10 10 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Sat 10/26 10:11 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kd)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Sat 10/26 10:11 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (kd)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 10/25 11:41 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Kartek Automotive, Inc., Lasky Properties LLC. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 10/25 11:37 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 10/25 11:37 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 10/25 11:36 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 10/23 1:50 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 10/23 1:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 10/23 1:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ignacio Vera. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 10/23 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38452163 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Ignacio Vera(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]