Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Franklin U Valderrama
Referred: M David Weisman
Case #: 1:24-cv-10925
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 3:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Darren Gourley Florida
Represented By
Brady Carlton Mcmillin
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Daniel Stephen Donovan
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Justin A Allen
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Brady C. McMillin
Nixon Peabody
contact info
Scott McLaughlin
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Defendant
Mainline Information Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Brady Carlton Mcmillin
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Daniel Stephen Donovan
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Justin A Allen
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Brady C. McMillin
Nixon Peabody
contact info
Scott McLaughlin
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Rusk Florida
Represented By
Brady Carlton Mcmillin
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Daniel Stephen Donovan
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Justin A Allen
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Brady C. McMillin
Nixon Peabody
contact info
Scott McLaughlin
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Plaintiff
CDW Corporation
Represented By
Ashleigh Ann Stochel
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Edward M Casmere
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Greg Nightingale Florida
Terminated: 12/23/2024
Represented By
Brady Carlton Mcmillin
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Daniel Stephen Donovan
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Brady C. McMillin
Nixon Peabody
contact info
Scott McLaughlin
Ogletree Deakins
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 6:41 AM CDT
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (lcd, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lcd, )
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs COMPLAINT filed by CDW Corporation; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22645652.(Casmere, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs CIVIL Cover Sheet (Casmere, Edward)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CDW Corporation by Edward M Casmere (Casmere, Edward)
Related: [-]
4 4 8 pgs EXHIBIT by Plaintiff CDW Corporation Exhibit A regarding complaint1 (Casmere, Edward)
Related: [-]