Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Katherine A Crytzer
Referred: Debra C Poplin
Case #: 3:24-cv-00425
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseInternational Child Abduction Remedies Act
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:38 AM EDT
Petitioner
Esther Haya Cohen Allen
Represented By
Peter Alan Newman
Chambliss Bahner & Stophel, PC
contact info
James F Exum, III
Chambliss, Bahner & Stophel, P.C.
contact info
Respondent
Gary Lynn Allen
Represented By
Ashley N Goins
Stites & Harbison, Pllc (nashville)
contact info
Gregory D Smith
Law Office Of Gregory D. Smith
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/05 11:08 AM
ORDER CLOSING CASE: Here, the Parties satisfied the requirements for dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) in their Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal [See Doc. 24]. As such, the Parties' stipulation was effective on February 4, when filed.And no order from this Court is required. Because there are no issues remaining in this action, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close the case. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 02/05/2025. (CAT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/04 1:25 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Gary Lynn Allen and by Esther Haya Cohen Allen.(Exum, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Agreed Order of Dismissal
Thursday, January 02, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Thu 01/02 5:02 PM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Gary Lynn Allen (Goins, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
22 22 misc Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf) Mon 12/23 10:18 AM
COURT REPORTER NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Kara Nagorny of Video scheduling conference before Judge Katherine A. Crytzer on 12/20/2024. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of TN before Judge Katherine A. Crytzer on 12/20/2024. By s/ Kara Nagorny. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only). (KLN)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
21 21 order Scheduling Order Fri 12/20 4:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 7/1/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2025 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 12/20/24. (ABF)
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 12/20 11:29 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer: Video Scheduling Conference held on 12/20/2024. Scheduling Order to follow. Court Reporter: Kara Nagorny (JDH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/18 4:53 PM
NOTICE by Gary Lynn Allen re18 Order,,,, Terminate Motions,,, Supplemental (Goins, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 12/16 11:16 AM
ORDER granting 13 MOTION to Expedite and for a Scheduling Order filed by Esther Haya Cohen Allen. The Court will hold a virtual Rule 16 Scheduling Conference December 20, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. The Court will contact the attorneys of record to provide login information. If either Party wishes to raise any item for the Court's consideration that is not already included in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report" [Doc. 12] or Petitioner's "Motion to Expedite" [Doc. 13] and "Memorandum in Support" [Doc. 14], that Party MUST file a supplemental Notice by December 18, 2024. (Virtual Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer). Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 12/16/2024. (LCK)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/13 2:05 PM
NOTICE by Esther Haya Cohen Allen of Service of Initial Disclosures (Exum, James)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac) Fri 12/13 1:10 PM
INFORMATIONAL Notice to Counsel re:15 Notice (Other) : Discovery documents improperly filed (See FRCP 5(d)). (ABF)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/13 1:02 PM
NOTICE by Gary Lynn Allen Providing Initial Disclosures (Goins, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
14 14 3 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 12/02 2:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re13 MOTION to Expedite and for a Scheduling Order filed by Esther Haya Cohen Allen. (Exum, James)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Expedite Mon 12/02 2:53 PM
MOTION to Expedite and for a Scheduling Order by Esther Haya Cohen Allen. (Exum, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 12/02 2:50 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Exum, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Fri 11/22 8:08 AM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/22/2024. (JCK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Consent Form
Thursday, November 21, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Answer to Complaint Thu 11/21 11:02 PM
Father's ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint,, Father's , ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint,, by Gary Lynn Allen.(Goins, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit March 3, 2024, Israeli Court Transcript and Ruling,
Att: 2 Exhibit April 2, 2024 Israeli Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Email Correspondence between Mother and Knox County Chancery Court,
Att: 4 Exhibit February 22, 2024 Letter from Head of School, Stanford Eisenberg Knoxville Day School,
Att: 5 Exhibit Israel GAL Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit March 12, 2024 Israeli Court Order,
Att: 7 Exhibit April 1, 2024 Israeli Court Order,
Att: 8 Exhibit May 8, 2024 Israeli Court Order,
Att: 9 Exhibit Knox County Chancery Court Order from May 28, 2024 Hearing,
Att: 10 Exhibit Knox County Chancery Court Order from June 5, 2024,
Att: 11 Exhibit Knox County Chancery Court Order from June 21, 2024 Hearing,
Att: 12 Exhibit Knox County Chancery Court Order from July 16, 2024
Thursday, November 07, 2024
misc Public Docket Annotation Thu 11/07 8:59 AM
Gavel Order 9 mailed to Respondent Gary Lynn Allen. (LCK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
9 9 order Order Wed 11/06 1:43 PM
ORDER . The Court ORDERS the Parties to confer and submit the required Rule 26(f) report on or before December 2, 2024. For the convenience of the Parties, the Court's Judicial Preferences and a Sample Civil Scheduling Order are available at https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/katherine-crytzer-united-states-district-judge. The Court will determine whether to hold a Rule 16 scheduling conference after receiving the Parties' Rule 26(f) report. Signed by District Judge Katherine A. Crytzer on 11/6/2024. This docket entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. (CBC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed (non-USA) Tue 11/05 5:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esther Haya Cohen Allen. Gary Lynn Allen served on 11/1/2024. (Exum, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/25 4:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT [Per Doc. 6] for Return of Minor Children to Petitioner against Gary Lynn Allen., filed by Esther Haya Cohen Allen.(Exum, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Convention,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - ICARA,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Laws of the State of Israel Vol. 16,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Marriage Certificate,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Birth Certificates,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Divorce Complaint
Thursday, October 24, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Thu 10/24 4:53 PM
ORDER re 1 Complaint. On October 23, 2024, Petitioner, who is represented by counsel, filed a Complaint that does not comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. To protect personal identifiable information contained in the Complaint, the Court orders the Clerks Office to seal the Complaint and exhibits. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 26.2. By October 29, 2024, Petitioner shall file a Complaint that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. Failure to timely comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 10/24/2024. (Copy of Order mailed to Gary Lynn Allen). (LCK)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 10/24 3:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Gary Lynn Allen. (CAT)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Thu 10/24 3:28 PM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 10/24/2024. (Copy of Order mailed to Gary Allen) (CAT)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Thu 10/24 3:24 PM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 10/24/2024. (Copy of Order mailed to Gary Allen) (CAT)
Related: [-]
2 2 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Thu 10/24 2:53 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 10/24/2025. (Copy of Order mailed to Gary Allen) (CAT)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 10/24 2:39 PM
District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (CAT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/23 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT FOR RETURN OF MINOR CHILDREN TO PETITIONER against Gary Lynn Allen ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5818487.), filed by Esther Haya Cohen Allen.(Exum, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplement Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Convention,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B - ICARA,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Laws of the State of Israel Vol. 16,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Marriage Certificate,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit E - Birth Certificates,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit F - Divorce Complaint