Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-06034
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
Kidde PLC
Defendant
E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
3M Company
Plaintiff
Gail Strindberg
Represented By
Michael S Werner
Slater Slater Schulman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kurt Alloway
Represented By
Michael S Werner
Slater Slater Schulman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Wed 10/23 3:09 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 10/23/2024), Kurt Alloway et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-06034-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: District Court of Utah (wmil, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 10/23 3:08 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil, )
Related: [-]
1 1 43 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/23 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12064744.), filed by Gail Strindberg, Kurt Alloway. Service due by 1/21/2025(wmil, )
Related: [-]