North Dakota District Court
Judge:Daniel L Hovland
Case #: 1:24-cv-00216
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 3:23 AM CDT
Defendant
ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By
Scott A. Jurchisin
Larson King, LLP
contact info
Jack E. Zuger
Larsonking, LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-5
Defendant
Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC
Defendant
North Plains Consulting Services
Defendant
Pathfinder Inspections & Field Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Mattea Peyatt
Represented By
H. Patrick Weir, Jr.
Vogel Law Firm (fargo)
contact info
Jordan B. Weir
Vogel Law Firm (fargo)
contact info
Plaintiff
Tyrell Peyatt
Represented By
H. Patrick Weir, Jr.
Vogel Law Firm (fargo)
contact info
Jordan B. Weir
Vogel Law Firm (fargo)
contact info

GPO Nov 21 2024
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2024 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(GW)
GPO Dec 12 2024
ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/10/2025 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG)
GPO Jan 15 2025
ORDER adopting in part 20 Stipulation filed by ConocoPhillips Company. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(GW) (Main Document 21 replaced on 1/15/2025 to correct a typographical error.) Regenerated NEF. (jb)
GPO Mar 10 2025
ORDER Amending Deadlines: Join Additional Parties due by 3/24/2025; Proposed Amended Complaint due by March 24, 2025. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW)
GPO Mar 24 2025
ORDER adopting 29 Stipulation and granting Plaintiffs' 24 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint due by 4/4/2025. (BG)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
35 35 service Certificate of Service Wed 05/14 1:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pathfinder Inspections & Field Services, LLC re34 Answer to Amended Complaint (Vendsel, Jason)
Related: [-]
34 34 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 05/14 1:12 PM
ANSWER to31 Amended Complaint by Pathfinder Inspections & Field Services, LLC.(Vendsel, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
33 33 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 04/15 12:13 PM
ANSWER to31 Amended Complaint by ConocoPhillips Company.(Zuger, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
32 32 service Summons Issued Tue 03/25 10:33 AM
Summons Issued as to Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC, North Plains Consulting Services, Pathfinder Inspections & Field Services, LLC. (mf)
Related: [-]
31 31 10 pgs cmp Amended Complaint (Call Court if Complaint Adds Parties) Tue 03/25 10:23 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ConocoPhillips Company, John Does 1-5, Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC, North Plains Consulting Services, Pathfinder Inspections & Field Services, LLC filed by Tyrell Peyatt, Mattea Peyatt.(mf)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Tue 03/25 2:15 PM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:29 Stipulation. Clerk's office added filer (Mattea Peyatt). (rh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
30 30 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 03/24 4:32 PM
ORDER adopting29 Stipulation and granting Plaintiffs'24 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint due by 4/4/2025. (BG)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Stipulation Mon 03/24 2:28 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint by Tyrell Peyatt.(Weir, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A-Amended Complaint
Monday, March 10, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/10 10:36 AM
ORDER Amending Deadlines: Join Additional Parties due by 3/24/2025; Proposed Amended Complaint due by March 24, 2025. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW)
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes Mid-Discovery Status Conference Mon 03/10 10:26 AM
(Text only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Mid-Discovery Status Conference held on 3/10/2025. (GW)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Mon 03/10 10:35 AM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:26 Affidavit Declaration of Jordan B. Weir. Clerk's office added link and added exhibit letter to attachment. (jb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
26 26 misc Affidavit Fri 03/07 12:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Jordan B. Weir in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint re25 MEMORANDUM in Support, by Mattea Peyatt, Tyrell Peyatt.(Weir, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter from Defense
25 25 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 03/07 11:59 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re24 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Mattea Peyatt, Tyrell Peyatt. (Weir, Jordan)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Amend/Correct Fri 03/07 11:56 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Mattea Peyatt, Tyrell Peyatt. (Weir, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
23 23 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 02/11 9:16 AM
(Text Only) ORDER adopting22 Stipulation filed by Tyrell Peyatt, Mattea Peyatt. Join Additional Parties due by 3/10/2025. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(GW)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
22 22 misc Stipulation Mon 02/10 9:31 AM
STIPULATION to Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings to Join Additional Parties by Tyrell Peyatt, Mattea Peyatt. (Weir, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/15 9:43 AM
ORDER adopting in part20 Stipulation filed by ConocoPhillips Company. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(GW) (Main Document 21 replaced on 1/15/2025 to correct a typographical error.) Regenerated NEF. (jb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
20 20 misc Stipulation Tue 01/14 4:18 PM
STIPULATION for a Protective Order by ConocoPhillips Company. (Zuger, Jack)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
19 19 5 pgs order Order for Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Deadlines Thu 12/12 9:52 AM
Order for Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Deadlines. Two business days prior to the Final Pretrial Conference, counsel must email the Exhibit List and Witness List for each party and Expert Reports to: ndd_J-Hochhalter@ndd.uscourts.gov. Trial Memorandum due at least 7 days prior to trial. Deposition designations due at least 14 days prior to trial. Additional deposition designations by opposing parties due 7 days prior to trial. Objections to deposition designations due 4 days prior to trial. Jury Instructions due at least 7 days prior to trial. Motions in limine due 30 days prior to trial. Additional deadlines and details contained in the Order. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2026 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 12/12 9:50 AM
ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/10/2025 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/12 9:48 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 7/25/2025. Discovery Motions due by 8/4/2025. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/22/2025. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/19/2025. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 10/31/2025. Join Additional Parties due by 2/10/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/2025. Nondispositive Motions due by 4/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 10/17/2025. (BG)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 12/12 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 9/28/2026 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days) (BG)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 12/12 9:18 AM
(Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2024. (BG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
utility Docket Correction Tue 12/10 2:05 PM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:14 STIPULATION. Document should have been emailed to chambers in WordPerfect of Word format per Order at13 . Clerk's Office restricted access to document. Parties are directed to email document to chambers. (sl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation Mon 12/09 2:53 PM
STIPULATION re13 Order, Set Hearings Discovery Plan by Tyrell Peyatt. (Weir, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
13 13 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/21 9:02 AM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2024 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(GW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/20 9:15 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips Company identifying Other Affiliate ConocoPhillips for ConocoPhillips Company.. (Zuger, Jack)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/20 9:00 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ConocoPhillips Company.(Zuger, Jack)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
10 10 misc Consent/Reassignment Form Wed 11/13 11:36 AM
CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by ConocoPhillips Company. (mf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
9 9 order Order Reassigning Case Mon 11/04 4:53 PM
(Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(jb)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent/Reassignment Form Mon 11/04 4:50 PM
CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Tyrell Peyatt, Mattea Peyatt. (jb)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Direct Assignment Mon 11/04 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to ConocoPhillips Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/18/2024. (rh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 9:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Jurchisin on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company (Jurchisin, Scott)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jack E. Zuger on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company (Zuger, Jack)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Direct Assignment Wed 10/23 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Mattea Peyatt. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/6/2024. (jb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Direct Assignment Wed 10/23 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Tyrell Peyatt. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/6/2024. (jb)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 10/23 4:29 PM
Summons Issued as to ConocoPhillips Company, John Does 1-5. (jb)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/23 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT against ConocoPhillips Company, John Does 1-5 (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100002657) filed by Tyrell Peyatt, Mattea Peyatt.(jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet