ABG EPE IP, LLC v. 1GiftShopForYou et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Tiffany R Johnson |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03977 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 28:1338 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 3:36 AM EST |
Defendant
13Bedding Duvet Cover
|
|
Defendant
14catstore
|
|
Defendant
16Bedding Duvet Cover
|
|
Defendant
1GiftShopForYou
|
|
Defendant
6D Bedding Duvet Cover
|
|
Defendant
ADTheCanvasArt
|
|
Defendant
ARtYAwalldecor
|
|
Defendant
AbbySports
|
|
Defendant
AkaShipuCanvas
|
|
Defendant
Alyaswallart
|
|
Defendant
ArtsBer
|
|
Defendant
AsgarHomeDesign
|
|
Defendant
AtelierQueenbee
|
|
Defendant
AtlantisWallArt
|
|
Defendant
Avantgarde3dStudio
|
|
Defendant
BaHauStore
|
|
Defendant
BestPosterEver
|
|
Defendant
BlueCanvasArtStore
|
|
Defendant
BusseCanvasArt
|
|
Defendant
BusyBroadJP
|
|
Defendant
CarpetDecorHome
|
|
Defendant
Cartoon aggregate
|
|
Defendant
Chuangle Product Creation Factory
|
|
Defendant
CommaCanvasArt
|
|
Defendant
CrocBoutiquee
|
|
Defendant
CuteCanvasArtByMary
|
|
Defendant
DarkFlamingoDesign
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Smart Gifts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Sunshine Tin Box Co.,LTD.
|
|
Defendant
Dongguan Yuchen Fashion Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Dongyang Baiyun Anxin Wig Factory
|
|
Defendant
EmyKi
|
|
Defendant
ExtensiveArts
|
|
Defendant
FENGZEQUBINGOBIANLIDIAN
|
|
Defendant
Fulei35's Shop
|
|
Defendant
Fuzhou Jinhao Cracts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
GiftyFramesDesign
|
|
Defendant
GloriumArt
|
|
Defendant
GoodviewVintageShop
|
|
Defendant
GreatSouvenirsShop
|
|
Defendant
HH-ART-PAINTING
|
|
Defendant
HadiMetalWallArt
|
|
Defendant
Hangzhou Chuanggao Craft Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hunan Hyf Merchandise Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
HyperconDesigns
|
|
Defendant
KING INTERNATIONAL
|
|
Defendant
LailaCanvasShop
|
|
Defendant
LeilaDesignFabric
|
|
Defendant
LekArtDecor
|
|
Defendant
Li-Planet
|
|
Defendant
LiveWallArts
|
|
Defendant
Lkb115VintageShop
|
|
Defendant
LovelyTee Store
|
|
Defendant
Luoyang Prow Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ly Khanh Do
|
|
Defendant
Ly Thi Cam Nguyen
|
|
Defendant
MC_melody
|
|
Defendant
MagicalScissBoutique
|
|
Defendant
MrMrsShopDesign
|
|
Defendant
NHUNG TUYET THI DUONG
|
|
Defendant
NesliArts
|
|
Defendant
Nhagal
|
|
Defendant
NhanNhan 2023
|
|
Defendant
OgeyWallArt
|
|
Defendant
OzCanvas
|
|
Defendant
PENCHON
|
|
Defendant
PWallArts
|
|
Defendant
PassionWallArts
|
|
Defendant
PuTianShiChengXiangQuWangHanLingMaoYiYouXianGongSi
|
|
Defendant
PuntArtStore
|
|
Defendant
Quanzhou Simba Supply Chain Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Quzhou Nishaer E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ravezza
|
|
Defendant
Rubywallart
|
|
Defendant
SUPERB COLLECTION INCORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
SargasCanvasArt
|
|
Defendant
SeventyCanvasStudios
|
|
Defendant
Shanxi Jakcom Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Pinyu Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Shenman Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SilverHomeArts
|
|
Defendant
Sunmelody
|
|
Defendant
Suzhou Chuan Zai Gu Clothing Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Tomoko Takemoto
|
|
Defendant
Tung Xuan Cao
|
|
Defendant
VoixeCanvss
|
|
Defendant
Wahaj Shahzad
|
|
Defendant
WawaMame
|
|
Defendant
Weihai Glodenleaveshair Products Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
YeahUvintage
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Cora Trade Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Fenghao Clothing Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Genmei Wig Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Happy Party Crafts Factory
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Hongliang Crafts Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Minco Import And Export Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Qianying Jewelry Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Rynel Garment Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Tingdu Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Yushang Cosmetics Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
ZHCollection
|
|
Defendant
activedonewow
|
|
Defendant
bed sheet and comforter set 1
|
|
Defendant
bed sheet and comforter set 2
|
|
Defendant
beddings wd
|
|
Defendant
better.cos
|
|
Defendant
cenqinghu-shop
|
|
Defendant
chentengshangmao1
|
|
Defendant
coinsboy
|
|
Defendant
dongguanjotintec0
|
|
Defendant
easytransferservice_0
|
|
Defendant
esaArtDesign
|
|
Defendant
ezhoushixiangshiyangbaihuoshanghang
|
|
Defendant
feizixiao8891
|
|
Defendant
fuqingshihongrongmaoyishanghang
|
|
Defendant
goodto-29
|
|
Defendant
guang zhou long wen shang mao dian ge ren du zi
|
|
Defendant
gunri8747
|
|
Defendant
happyecologyh_0
|
|
Defendant
hefeimodibaihuoshanghang
|
|
Defendant
honorhardwarewa0
|
|
Defendant
jazzguitars567
|
|
Defendant
jinlan_73
|
|
Defendant
krhavlu0
|
|
Defendant
madebysrk
|
|
Defendant
mystore1-2-3
|
|
Defendant
narendr bareth
|
|
Defendant
nguyen danh le
|
|
Defendant
pacome-72
|
|
Defendant
phuong thi minh nong
|
|
Defendant
putianshilichengqurongchunyanmaoyiyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
putianshilichengyanjianxiangshangmaoyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
shen zhen shi jin gang ke ji you xian gong si
|
|
Defendant
shoppivistore
|
|
Defendant
skywallartdesign
|
|
Defendant
uk89-kky
|
|
Defendant
vanke3-4
|
|
Defendant
volta03
|
|
Defendant
wodenna2023
|
|
Defendant
zhengzhoushizhongyuanqumingrenbaihuoshanghan
|
|
Defendant
zhuqiu
|
|
Plaintiff
ABG EPE IP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
01baiyun
Terminated: 12/23/2024
|
|
Defendant
3D wuyonq
Terminated: 12/09/2024
|
|
Defendant
3DerStudio
Terminated: 11/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
3XUdesign
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
AJMElvisCostumes
Terminated: 01/13/2025
|
|
Defendant
ALCO Toys Store JD
Terminated: 11/19/2024
|
|
Defendant
CanvasShopCreative
Terminated: 02/19/2025
|
|
Defendant
Cocosopra's Boutique
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
EVENTGIFTSTORE
Terminated: 11/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Eggty Technology Limited
Terminated: 11/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
F15650-6
Terminated: 11/30/2024
|
|
Defendant
FineArtModernShop
Terminated: 02/04/2025
|
|
Defendant
Funko Fans
Terminated: 12/09/2024
|
|
Defendant
GO666
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
JW Art Print
Terminated: 11/25/2024
|
|
Defendant
JianDeShiXinAnJiangJieDaoYunYanMeiJiaDian
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
LeliaCase
Terminated: 12/09/2024
|
|
Defendant
Lynnstore1
Terminated: 10/22/2024
|
|
Defendant
Metal Archaeology
Terminated: 10/28/2024
|
|
Defendant
More Persi
Terminated: 10/22/2024
|
|
Defendant
NewWallDecor
Terminated: 11/19/2024
|
|
Defendant
OZLEM ATESLI BILDIRICI
Terminated: 01/07/2025
|
|
Defendant
Play Collectibles
Terminated: 12/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
Prime Finds Boutique
Terminated: 10/22/2024
|
|
Defendant
Quanzhou Shandian Electronic Commerce Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 11/19/2024
|
|
Defendant
Rareak
Terminated: 01/21/2025
|
|
Defendant
Redstoneer
Terminated: 12/23/2024
|
|
Defendant
Retro Vintage Istanbul Shop
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
RitmoArt
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
RuAtika
Terminated: 01/07/2025
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Chuangcheng Era Trading Co., Ltd
Terminated: 11/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Zhong Yi Paper Products Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 03/03/2025
|
|
Defendant
SocietyCanvas
Terminated: 01/27/2025
|
|
Defendant
Super Broadway_Rikilo
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
TSHIRTGB
Terminated: 11/19/2024
|
|
Defendant
TopperDesigner
Terminated: 11/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Turkrexrecords
Terminated: 11/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
UnikMart
Terminated: 11/19/2024
|
|
Defendant
WorldWallArtShop
Terminated: 11/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
Y8X Store
Terminated: 10/22/2024
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Gongming Trading Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 11/30/2024
|
|
Defendant
Yiwu Zhaobao Trading Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 01/13/2025
|
|
Defendant
Zhejiang Mavilee International Trade Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 10/22/2024
|
|
Defendant
Zhongshan Ho Crafts And Gifts Co., Limited
Terminated: 01/21/2025
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
action f t
Terminated: 11/30/2024
|
|
Defendant
akasiaCaseCraft
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
andexun2024
Terminated: 12/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
apartbig
Terminated: 12/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
arieser
Terminated: 12/23/2024
|
|
Defendant
canvasboutiquework
Terminated: 11/19/2024
|
|
Defendant
chaoziclothes
Terminated: 11/19/2024
|
|
Defendant
chaoziji_0
Terminated: 11/19/2024
|
|
Defendant
emintextile
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
fotokart
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
fuqingxingyangmaoyiyouxiangongsi
Terminated: 11/25/2024
|
|
Defendant
girl_boy20238
Terminated: 11/19/2024
|
|
Defendant
gokcecollection
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
greeneight
Terminated: 11/19/2024
|
|
Defendant
jackychenart
Terminated: 11/25/2024
|
|
Defendant
jakele
Terminated: 12/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
js_brick
Terminated: 11/25/2024
|
|
Defendant
kevin-store
Terminated: 10/22/2024
|
|
Defendant
maxvintageshop
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
maydevise2023
Terminated: 11/19/2024
|
|
Defendant
mecmarc
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
menny20406080
Terminated: 10/22/2024
|
|
Defendant
oguztolga
Terminated: 11/20/2024
|
|
Defendant
oliber2
Terminated: 12/09/2024
|
|
Defendant
rayspchongkong
Terminated: 12/23/2024
|
|
Defendant
siupo23
Terminated: 11/25/2024
|
|
Defendant
siwarel
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
snake-deals
Terminated: 10/22/2024
|
|
Defendant
sweethome6
Terminated: 12/09/2024
|
|
Defendant
tapoo80
Terminated: 10/22/2024
|
|
Defendant
tilleyart
Terminated: 12/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
trendydealsstore
Terminated: 10/22/2024
|
|
Defendant
uk-retailer
Terminated: 11/13/2024
|
|
Defendant
xiamenshihuliquyuanzhichanshangmaohang
Terminated: 11/04/2024
|
|
Defendant
xichubawang
Terminated: 12/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
yuvalg43User ID
Terminated: 10/22/2024
|
|
Defendant
zhouwenwang
Terminated: 12/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
zihnimuzik
Terminated: 11/19/2024
|
|
Defendant
zk2026
Terminated: 12/16/2024
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Tue 04/01 11:48 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING53 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to skywallartdesign (jbu) |
||
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
53 | 53
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Round 21) filed by ABG EPE IP, LLC (Hanlon, Carrie) |