California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kirk E Sherriff
Referred: Sheila K Oberto
Case #: 1:24-cv-01291
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Terminated:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Camarena Health
730 North I Street
Madera, CA 93637
Defendant
Samantha Jo Gallo
P.A. 49165 Road 426
Oakhurst, CA 93644
Plaintiff
K. L.
Represented By
Jason Argos
Argos Law, Apc
contact info

GPO Nov 14 2024
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to CLOSE the CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/14/2024. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)

Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago
Thursday, November 14, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 11/14 3:52 PM
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to CLOSE the CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/14/2024. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/13 6:35 PM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by K. L.. (Argos, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
5 5 6 pgs misc Civil New Case Documents for KES Wed 10/23 1:41 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2025 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Wed 10/23 1:38 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Camarena Health, Samantha Jo Gallo* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jason Argos* *Argos Law, APC* *280 Newport Center Drive, Suite 240* *Newport Beach, CA 92660*. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/23 10:48 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by K.L. (Argos, Jason)
Related: [-]
misc Receipt Wed 10/23 1:31 PM
RECEIPT number ACAEDC-11819622 for $405.00 fbo K. L. from Jason Argos. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]