New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-15160
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2024
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
PRAVEEN MORGAN (1)
Terminated: 09/24/2024
Represented By
TIMOTHY DONAHUE
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Terminated: 09/24/2024
Represented By
JAVON HENRY
Doj-Usao
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 10/24/2024 5:01 AM EDT
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
Arrest of PRAVEEN MORGAN (smf)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams:Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings as to PRAVEEN MORGAN held on 9/24/2024 (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (smf) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/3/2024) (smf).
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to PRAVEEN MORGAN TIMOTHY DONAHUE for PRAVEEN MORGAN appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 9/24/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
5 5 UNSECURED Bond Entered as to PRAVEEN MORGAN in amount of $ 100,000, (smf, )
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to PRAVEEN MORGAN (1) 100,000 (Finance notified) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 9/24/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by PRAVEEN MORGAN (smf, )
Related: [-]