Utah District Court
Judge:Jill N Parrish
Referred: Cecilia M Romero
Case #: 2:24-cv-00802
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 2:40 AM MDT
Defendant
Brad Shepherd
Represented By
Liesel B. Stevens
Ray Quinney & Nebeker PC
contact info
Defendant
Shepherds All Star Lanes
Represented By
Liesel B. Stevens
Ray Quinney & Nebeker PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Theresa Bujold
Represented By
Gregory Brent Smith
Greg Smith And Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
24 24 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/29 11:07 AM
AMENDED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Pre-Settlement Conference reset for 6/9/2025 at 09:30 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Settlement Conference reset for 6/24/2025 at 09:30 AM in Judges Chambers before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/29/25 (alt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
23 23 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 03/11 1:38 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for Friday, June 13, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. via Zoom before Chief Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Pre-settlement Conference Call set for Monday, June 2, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. via Zoom before Chief Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/11/25. (dle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 03/10 11:36 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL: Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 3/10/25. (dle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
21 21 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 03/04 3:26 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1) for Judicial Settlement Conference. Counsel shall, by 3/7/2025, jointly contact the Magistrate Judge to schedule the settlement conference. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 3/4/2025. (eat)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Judicial Settlement Conference Tue 03/04 3:23 PM
ORDER granting 19 Stipulated Motion for Judicial Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 3/4/2025. (eat)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
19 19 motion Judicial Settlement Conference Mon 03/03 4:17 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Judicial Settlement Conference filed by Defendants Brad Shepherd, Shepherds All Star Lanes. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Stevens, Liesel)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
18 18 misc Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty) Mon 02/24 4:46 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Shepherds All Star Lanes identifying Shepherd's All Star Lanes, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Stevens, Liesel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Thu 02/13 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Theresa Bujold, Defendants Brad Shepherd, Shepherds All Star Lanes. (dle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/11 11:36 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by Brad Shepherd, Shepherds All Star Lanes.(Stevens, Liesel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Acknowledgment Wed 01/29 11:22 AM
NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order9 filed by Defendants Brad Shepherd, Shepherds All Star Lanes (Stevens, Liesel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 01/22 5:18 PM
ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re Complaint. Response/answer deadlines for Brad Shepherd and Shepherds All Star Lanes are extended to up to and including 2/11/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 1/22/25 (alt)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/22 9:03 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint filed by Defendants Brad Shepherd, Shepherds All Star Lanes. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero. Attorney Liesel B. Stevens added to party Brad Shepherd(pty:dft), Attorney Liesel B. Stevens added to party Shepherds All Star Lanes(pty:dft)(Stevens, Liesel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 09, 2025
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/09 12:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Theresa Bujold. Summons as to Shepherds All Star Lanes.(Smith, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Summons
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/09 12:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Theresa Bujold. Summons as to Brad Shepherd.(Smith, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Summons
Friday, November 08, 2024
10 10 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Fri 11/08 11:38 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/8/2024. (kec)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
9 9 order Civil Standing Order Thu 11/07 3:58 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/7/2024. (lwh)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 11/07 3:57 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/7/2024. (lwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Electronically Thu 10/24 10:54 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Shepherds All Star Lanes. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Electronically Thu 10/24 10:54 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Brad Shepherd. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request Summons Thu 10/24 10:44 AM
Requested Summons as to Shepherds All Star Lanes. (Smith, Gregory)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request Summons Thu 10/24 10:40 AM
Requested Summons as to Brad Shepherd. (Smith, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 10/24 9:38 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Defendant Shepherds All Star Lanes. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 11/14/2024. (sg)
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Thu 10/24 8:59 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5224007) filed by Theresa Bujold. (Smith, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Thu 10/24 7:51 AM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Theresa Bujold is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (sg)
Related: [-]