Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John E Steele
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:24-cv-00987
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Terminated:Feb 11, 2025
Case in other court:Twentieth Judicial Circuit for Collier County, 11-02024-CA-002061
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Pease Bell CPAs, LLC
Represented By
Richard T. Hamilton, Jr.
Ub Greensfelder LLP
contact info
Alan Mitchell Wolper
Ub Greensfelder LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer A. Barnes
Represented By
Richard T. Hamilton, Jr.
Ub Greensfelder LLP
contact info
Alan Mitchell Wolper
Ub Greensfelder LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert W. Sly
Represented By
Mathew E. Doney
Brennan Manna Diamond, LLC
contact info
Alicia M Kupcinskas
Brennan Manna Diamond
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 03, 2025
45 45 misc Judgment Mon 03/03 8:55 AM
A judgment was entered, dismissing this action with prejudice. ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RLK)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
44 44 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/28 9:34 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk to enter judgment pursuant to the parties' 43 Stipulation and close the case. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/28/2025. (RKR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
43 43 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/27 6:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Pease Bell CPAs, LLC. (Hamilton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
42 42 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 02/12 8:50 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
41 41 2 pgs order Order Administratively Closing Case Tue 02/11 12:50 PM
ORDER directing administrative closure for 30 days. All motions and deadlines are terminated in light of the administrative closure. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/11/2025. (RKR)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of settlement Tue 02/11 10:44 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Robert W. Sly (Doney, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
39 39 motion Dismiss / Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 01/09 7:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jennifer A. Barnes.(Hamilton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Exhibit A: Affidavit of Jennifer Barnes in support of Pease Bell's Motion to Dismiss
38 38 motion Dismiss / Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 01/09 7:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Pease Bell CPAs, LLC.(Hamilton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit ExhibitA: Affidavit of Jennifer Barnes in support of Pease Bell's Motion to Dismiss
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
37 37 adr Notice of selection of mediator Tue 12/31 3:00 PM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of Bradford D. Kimbro as mediator by Robert W. Sly. (Doney, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
36 36 order Order Tue 12/24 12:41 PM
TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff filed his Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures. But Rule 26(a) disclosures shall not be filed with the court as a matter of course. Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(1)(A); (Doc. 6 at 9-10). As such, the paper is deemed stricken, and the clerk is directed to delete the PDF file (Doc. 35 ) from the CM/ECF docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/24/2024. (TLP)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/23 3:19 PM
NOTICE by Robert W. Sly Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Doney, Mathew)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Mon 12/23 9:02 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 32 defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond. By January 9, 2025, defendants must respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/23/2024. (TLP)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
33 33 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Fri 12/20 1:19 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Jennifer A. Barnes. (Hamilton, Richard)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Fri 12/20 11:42 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to21 Amended Complaint, by All Defendants. (Hamilton, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified text on 12/20/2024 (ABM)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 12/20 8:56 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 1/22/2026 Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2026 at 09:30 AM before Judge John E. Steele Jury Trial term 11/2/2026 at 09:00 AM before Judge John E. Steele Conduct mediation hearing by 12/15/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/20/2024. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
30 30 minutes Preliminary pretrial conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 12/17 10:42 AM
Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell: granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of selection of mediator; Rule 16(b) Conference held on 12/17/2024. (digital) (WRW)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 12/17 10:40 AM
ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time to File notice of selection of mediator. (WRW)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Compliance notice Tue 12/17 9:34 AM
NOTICE of compliance re 22 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Robert W. Sly (Doney, Mathew) Modified on 12/17/2024 to edit text (FLY)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss / Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 12/16 2:40 PM
ORDER denying as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 12/16/2024. (RKR)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/16 10:24 AM
AMENDED TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS re 7 Notice of Hearing: Dial: 1-855-244-8681; Access code: 23044967785. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
25 25 service Summons returned executed Thu 12/12 1:40 PM
RETURN of service executed on 10/10/2024 by Robert W. Sly as to Jennifer A. Barnes. (Doney, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
24 24 misc Case Management Report Mon 12/09 4:18 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Doney, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
23 23 service Summons issued Fri 12/06 8:57 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Jennifer A. Barnes. (JK)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 12/06 8:53 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Mathew E. Doney of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
21 21 19 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/05 6:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert W. Sly with Jury Demand. filed by Robert W. Sly.(Doney, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Proposed Summons
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Wed 11/20 9:32 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond. By December 5, 2024, plaintiff must respond to defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. 14 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/20/2024. (TLP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 11/19 2:10 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Robert W. Sly. (Doney, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
misc Pay Fee Thu 11/07 3:22 PM
FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22700099 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Mathew E. Doney. (Kupcinskas, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
18 18 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 11/05 2:38 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Mathew E. Doney Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Pay the Special Admission Fee; The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/05 11:51 AM
ORDER granting 16 unopposed motion for special admission of attorney Mathew E. Doney. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/5/2024. (TLP)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/04 12:53 PM
NOTICE by Pease Bell CPAs, LLC re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Wolper, Alan)
Related: [-]
misc Pay Fee Mon 11/04 1:10 PM
FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22683652 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Richard Thomas Hamilton, Jr.. (Wolper, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/04 4:24 PM
MOTION for Mathew E. Doney to appear pro hac vice by Robert W. Sly. (e-portal). (JTM)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss / Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 10/31 2:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Pease Bell CPAs, LLC.(Wolper, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Exhibit1: Affidavit of Jennifer Barnes in support of Pease Bell's Motion to Dismiss
13 13 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 10/31 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Alan Mitchell Wolper on behalf of Pease Bell CPAs, LLC. Lead Counsel: Richard T. Hamilton, Jr.. (Wolper, Alan)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/31 10:14 AM
ORDER granting 10 unopposed motion for special admission of attorney Richard T. Hamilton, Jr. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/31/2024. (TLP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 10/29 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Alicia M Kupcinskas on behalf of Robert W. Sly. Lead Counsel: Alicia M. Kupcinskas. (Kupcinskas, Alicia)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 10/29 3:38 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Robert W. Sly. (Kupcinskas, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 10/28 2:27 PM
NOTICE of hearing: Rule 16(b) Conference set for 12/17/2024 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 12/9/2024. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 24987. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Civil Action Order Mon 10/28 2:04 PM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/28/2024. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 10/30 2:17 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard T Hamilton Jr. Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JTM)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/30 12:26 PM
MOTION for Richard Thomas Hamilton to appear pro hac vice by Pease Bell CPAs, LLC. (e-portal) (JTM)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 10/25 10:11 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Alicia M Kupcinskas of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
4 4 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/25 10:10 AM
COMPLAINT against Pease Bell CPAs, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Robert W. Sly. Filed in State Court on 10/1/2024.(GL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/24 4:01 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-00987-JES-NPM. (JOS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 10/24 3:46 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Pease Bell CPAs, LLC. (Wolper, Alan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 10/24 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Pease Bell CPAs, LLC from Twentieth Judicial Circuit in and for Collier County, case number 11-2024-CA-002061-0001 01 filed in State Court on 10/01/24. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22649252 filed by Pease Bell CPAs, LLC.(Wolper, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 1: State court filings attached as Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet State court docket sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 for Notice of Removal: Declaration of Jennifer Barnes,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet