North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: W Carleton Metcalf
Case #: 1:24-cv-00266
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Case in other court:Buncombe County Superior Court, 24CV208327-100
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Beacon Dermatology
Represented By
Sean C. Wagner
Wagner Hicks PLLC
contact info
James William Ray
Wagner Hicks PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Crystal George
229 Tarpley Trail Apt. 104
Asheville, NC 28806


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/07 9:47 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James William Ray terminated Text of Order: ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record is GRANTED, and James W. Ray is WITHDRAWN as counsel of record in this matter. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 5/7/2025. (kkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
25 25 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 05/06 5:15 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to James W. Ray by Beacon Dermatology. Responses due by 5/20/2025 (Ray, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 04/29 4:05 PM
ORDER denying 14 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 4/29/2025. (ams)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
23 23 notice PSAP Opt In/Out Response Fri 04/25 11:09 AM
Opt In of PSAP Program by Crystal George. (sc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
22 22 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/09 3:25 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 5 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Leave to Correct Previous Filing of Motion to Remand and to Address AI Certification and denying 9 Motion to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint to Include Wrongful Termination in Violation of Public Policy, for Remand to State Court Based on Amendment, and to Delay Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference and Discovery Plan. 4 PSAP Notice response time has been EXTENDED to and including 4/23/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 4/9/2025. (sc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/09 3:32 PM
Reset Deadlines: PSAP Response due by 4/23/2025. (sc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
21 21 misc Request to Receive Electronic Notification Mon 01/27 12:47 PM
Request to Receive Electronic Notification by Crystal George. (sc)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 01/24 4:22 PM
REPLY/Response to Beacon's Opposition to Motion re14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Crystal George. (sc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
19 19 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 01/15 2:28 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's 18 Request is GRANTED and Plaintiff's deadline to file a reply has been extended through and including 1/24/2025. Plaintiff is reminded that her future filings should include her physical signature. The deadline for the parties to file a Certificate of Initial Attorneys' Conference is HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of the Court. Plaintiff's request to delay, as set forth in the Motion to Amend, is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/15/2025. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (sc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time Tue 01/14 1:09 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's17 Response in Opposition to Motion by Crystal George. Responses due by 1/28/2025 (smm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification on Artificial Intelligence
Monday, December 30, 2024
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/30 4:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to 2 ANSWER filed and served 10/31/2024 by Beacon Dermatology. Replies due by 1/6/2025 (Wagner, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/17 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Errata by Crystal George re15 Reply to Response to Motion, (sc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 12/16 12:14 PM
LETTER in response to page 7, section III of Opposition Letter/REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION Delay of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference and Discovery Plan by Crystal George. (sc)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Default Judgment Mon 12/16 8:59 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment due to Defendant's Failure to File an Answer by Crystal George. (sc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
13 13 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/09 2:18 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re9 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION Delay of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference and Discovery Plan by Beacon Dermatology. Replies due by 12/16/2024 (Ray, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
12 12 service Certificate of Service Tue 11/26 5:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beacon Dermatology re10 Notice (Other),11 Notice of Appearance (AMENDED CERTIFICATE) (Wagner, Sean)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/26 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James William Ray on behalf of Beacon Dermatology (Ray, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/26 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Attempt to Conduct FED. R. CIV. P. 26(F) Initial Attorney Conference by Beacon Dermatology(Wagner, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Electronic Mail Correspondence between the Parties,
Att: 2 Defendant's Certification and Report of FED. R. CIV. P. 26(F) Initial Attorney Conference
Monday, November 25, 2024
9 9 motion Amend/Correct Remand to State Court Miscellaneous Relief Tue 11/26 3:23 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint to include wrongful termination in violation of public policy, MOTION to Remand to State Court based on amendment, and MOTION to delay Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f) Conference and Discovery Plan by Crystal George. No wet or s/signature provided on document. Responses due by 12/9/2024 (sc)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 11/26 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address from 229 Tarpley Trail Apt. 104 Asheville, NC 28806 to 212 Tarpley Trail Apt. 207 Asheville, NC 28806 by Crystal George. No case number provided on filing. Correct case number pulled from Motion filed in same case. Modified docket text on 11/26/2024 (sc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
7 7 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/18 5:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Beacon Dermatology. Replies due by 11/25/2024 (Wagner, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 motion Amend/Correct Wed 11/13 10:55 AM
MOTION for Leave to Correct Previous Filing of Motion to Remand and to Address AI Certification Re:5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Crystal George. No wet or s/signature provided on document. Responses due by 11/27/2024. (sc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
order Order of Instructions Wed 11/06 12:23 PM
Standing Order of Instructions Regarding Pro Se Litigants in Civil Actions. Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/6/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
5 5 motion Remand to State Court Wed 11/06 8:36 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court due to Untimeliness, Lack of Complete Diversity, and Inappropriate Assertion of Federal Question Jurisdiction by Crystal George. Responses due by 11/18/2024. No federal case number provided by filer; Clerk docketed in active case. No wet or s/signature provided on document. Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (kby)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility PSAP Notice to Opt In/Out Mon 11/04 10:00 AM
PSAP Opt In/Out Form mailed to Pro Se Litigant. PSAP Response due by 11/18/2024. (ams)
Related: [-]
order Order of Instructions Mon 11/04 10:10 AM
Standing Order of Instructions Regarding Pro Se Litigants in Civil Actions. Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/4/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/31 4:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beacon Dermatology. (Wagner, Sean)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/31 4:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Beacon Dermatology.(Wagner, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 10/24 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Buncombe County Superior Court for the State of North Carolina, case number 24CV208327-100. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6712721), filed by Beacon Dermatology(Wagner, Sean) Modified Defendant's name on 10/24/2024 (cly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Filings in State Court Action,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 11 October 2024 Emergency Order
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/24 3:40 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (cly)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Thu 10/24 3:41 PM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (cly)
Related: [-]