Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Arthur J Schwab
Case #: 2:24-cv-01472
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Case in other court:Court of Common Pleas of Beaver County, 24-11424
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Keith Yost Excavating, LLC
Represented By
Zachary G. Evans
Zimmer Kunz PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Zimmer Kunz
contact info
Mediator
ANDREW F. SZEFI
Represented By
Andrew F. Szefi
Knox Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Shick
Represented By
Jordan Bush
Morgan And Morgan
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Carl L. Stewart
Terminated: 12/18/2024
Represented By
Zachary G. Evans
Zimmer Kunz PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Zimmer Kunz
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
25 25 adr Report of Early Neutral Evaluation Wed 04/09 12:23 PM
REPORT of Early Neutral Evaluation Case has not resolved. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The online questionnaire can be accessed on [LINK:the court's website] . ENE session was held held on 4/9/2025. (Szefi, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
24 24 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Thu 03/20 3:22 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by Keith Yost Excavating, LLC. (keh)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Consent (Joint) to Proceed before US Mag. Judge Thu 03/20 12:21 PM
Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by Keith Yost Excavating, LLC. (Evans, Zachary) Document removed from public view and refiled at24 . Modified text on 3/20/2025. (keh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Early Neutral Evaluation ~Util - Case Referred to Early Neutral Evaluation Wed 03/05 11:21 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation, followed by Mediation. Hon. Andrew F. Szefi is appointed as an early neutral evaluator/mediator. Early neutral evaluation, followed by Mediation, is scheduled for 4/9/25. Counsel is to notify the Court if the mediation does not occur as scheduled. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/5/25. (ms)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Case Management Order Wed 03/05 11:17 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 3/5/2025; Motion to Compel due by 3/11/2025; Response to Motion to Compel due by 3/31/2025; Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2025; Discovery due by 7/18/2025; Plaintiff Pretrial Statement due by 9/16/2025; Defendant Pretrial Statement due by 9/26/2025; Plaintiff Expert Reports due by 6/18/2025; Defendant Expert Reports due by 7/8/2025; Expert Depositions to be completed by 7/18/2025; Summary Judgment due by 8/7/2025; Response to Summary Judgment due by 8/17/2025; Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 3/20/2025. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 3/5/25. (ms)
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Case Management Conference Wed 03/05 11:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Arthur J. Schwab: Case Management Conference held on 3/5/2025. Case Management Order issued. Parties agreed to Early Neutral Evaluation, followed by Mediation, before on Hon. Andrew F. Szefi on 4/9/25. Discussed pre-mediation/ENE discovery. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (Court Reporter: A. Martin) (ms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
19 19 motion Disclosure Tue 03/04 9:34 AM
Initial Disclosure Statement by Richard Shick. (Bush, Jordan) Document has been removed from public view, as it is considered discovery material per Local Rule 5.4. Modified text on 3/4/2025. (kss)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Tue 03/04 9:33 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by Richard Shick. (Bush, Jordan)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Document is discovery Tue 03/04 10:40 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re19 Initial Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Document is discovery material pursuant to Local Rule 5.4. CORRECTION: Document has been removed from public view. This message is for informational purposes only. (kss)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
17 17 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 02/17 10:16 AM
TEXT ORDER - Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/25 WILL NOW BE HELD ON 3/5/2025 at 09:00 AM by Video Conference before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/17/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
16 16 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 02/06 4:39 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Evans, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Thu 02/06 4:38 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by Keith Yost Excavating, LLC. (Evans, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 01/13 10:15 AM
ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 2/18/2025 at 08:45 AM by Video Conference before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due on 2/11/2025. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 1/13/2025. (lar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 01/09 4:04 PM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Keith Yost Excavating, LLC. (Evans, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 12/20 9:22 AM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from Keith Yost Excavating, LLC on 1/2/2025. (kss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/18 3:50 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Keith Yost Excavating, LLC Keith Yost Excavating, LLC answer due 1/7/2025, filed by Richard Shick. (Bush, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Wed 12/04 1:43 PM
ORDER approving10 Stipulation Resolving Rule 12 Motions filed by Keith Yost Excavating, LLC, Richard Shick. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 12/4/2024. (lar)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulation Wed 12/04 12:08 PM
STIPULATION Resolving Rule 12 Motions by Richard Shick, Keith Yost Excavating, LLC. (Evans, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
9 9 order Order Tue 10/29 5:07 PM
TEXT ORDER approving8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Keith Yost Excavating, LLC, Carl L. Stewart. Answers due 12/16/24. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/29/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lar)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/29 4:29 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by Keith Yost Excavating, LLC, Carl L. Stewart Answer due from Keith Yost Excavating, LLC on 12/16/2024; Carl L. Stewart on 12/16/2024. (Evans, Zachary)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Tue 10/29 12:53 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by Carl L. Stewart, Keith Yost Excavating, LLC. (Evans, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Mon 10/28 2:21 PM
ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/28/24. (ms)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice of ADR Designation Mon 10/28 2:19 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
4 4 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Fri 10/25 3:30 PM
Errata re2 Notice of Removal, by Keith Yost Excavating, LLC, Carl L. Stewart. Reason for Correction: Missing attorney information. (Evans, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/25 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Ramaley on behalf of Keith Yost Excavating, Carl Stewart. (Ramaley, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 10/25 2:44 PM
Judge Arthur J. Schwab added. (tla)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Attorney Signature Deficient Fri 10/25 2:46 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re2 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information, specifically the attorney email address. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) and refile the document using the Errata event. (tla)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Fri 10/25 2:48 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re2 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying both all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public AND citizenship as required pursuant to both LR 7.1.A and FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 11/1/2024. (tla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
2 2 cmp ATTORNEY Notice of Removal (Credit Card Required) Thu 10/24 1:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Beaver County, case number 24-11424 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8524762), filed by Keith Yost Excavating, Carl Stewart. (Evans, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Thu 10/24 1:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Beaver County, case number 24-11424 with y ( Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, ), filed by Keith Yost Excavating, Carl Stewart. (Evans, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D