Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:24-cv-01271
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 3:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Justin McLaughlin
Represented By
Charles Joseph Hubbard
Polsinelli P.C. (nashville Office)
contact info
Eric E. Packel
Polsinelli P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Keller North America, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph P. Shelton
Fisher & Phillips Llp (nashville)
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia McShane on behalf of Keller North America, Inc. (McShane, Marcia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/29 4:51 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic status conference will be held with counsel for the parties on Friday, May 2, 2025 at 4:00 p.m., in order to discuss the possible consolidation of this case with three other related cases. Judge Trauger's Courtroom Deputy will email to counsel the number they should call in order to participate in the telephone conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/29/2025. (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
24 24 order Protective Order Fri 03/28 10:52 AM
AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/28/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 03/28 10:50 AM
ORDER granting22 Joint Motion for Confidentiality and Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/28/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
22 22 motion Protective Order Thu 03/27 10:19 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality by Justin McLaughlin.(Hubbard, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Protective Order
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric E. Packel on behalf of Justin McLaughlin (Packel, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Mon 01/27 4:16 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 4/21/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2026 at 01:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List due by 4/14/2026. Witness List due by 4/14/2026. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/14/2026. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 01/27/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Case Management Order Mon 01/27 4:09 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2025. Discovery due by 9/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2025. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 01/27/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
18 18 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/22 3:04 PM
ORDER granting16 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Eric E. Packel to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 01/22/2025. (lh)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference Wed 01/22 3:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger: Case Management Conference held by telephone on 1/22/2025. (Hearing lasted :30)(kb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
17 17 misc Proposed Case Management Order Fri 01/17 10:12 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [joint] filed by Keller North America, Inc.. (Shelton, Joseph)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 01/17 10:06 AM
MO State Bar status verified as active for Eric Packel not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/16 5:33 PM
MOTION for attorney Eric E. Packel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4240423) by Justin McLaughlin.(Hubbard, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, January 06, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/06 3:29 PM
ORDER CONCERNING UPCOMING INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE: The initial case management conference in this case is scheduled for January 22, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. District Judge Aleta Trauger conducts her own initial case management conferences, and they are held IN PERSON, not by videoconference or telephone. Counsel is reminded that, as stated in the Notice setting the initial case management conference issued at the beginning of the case, LEAD COUNSEL for each party is required to attend the initial case management conference unless excused by order of the court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/6/2025. (ab)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
14 14 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Fri 01/03 9:07 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Justin McLaughlin. (kc)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 01/03 9:05 AM
ORDER granting12 Unopposed Motion to Amend Answer. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/2/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
12 12 motion Amend/Correct Thu 01/02 2:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer by Justin McLaughlin.(Hubbard, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Answer,
Att: 2 Attachment Proposed Order
Friday, December 27, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 12/27 4:32 PM
ORDER: Due to a lengthy civil case that the court will be trying, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for January 13, 2025 is RESET for Wednesday, January 22, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/27/2024. (ch)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/18 4:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Justin McLaughlin.(Hubbard, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 11/12 9:44 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Charles Joseph Hubbard admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/11 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Joseph Hubbard on behalf of Justin McLaughlin (Hubbard, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/01 12:02 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Keller North America, Inc.. Justin McLaughlin served on 10/28/2024. (Shelton, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
7 7 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Thu 10/24 4:13 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Keller North America, Inc.. (Shelton, Joseph)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Thu 10/24 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2025 at 03:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (sb)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 10/24 1:16 PM
Summons issued as to Justin McLaughlin. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (sb)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Thu 10/24 1:15 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Thu 10/24 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (sb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Thu 10/24 1:14 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/24 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Justin McLaughlin (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4188575), filed by Keller North America, Inc..(sb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 1 - McLaughlin Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - McLaughlin Reminder Letter,
Att: 3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 10/24 1:20 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Joseph P. Shelton admitted to this court . (sb)
Related: [-]