Delaware District Court
Judge:Maryellen Noreika
Case #: 1:24-cv-01192
Nature of Suit835 Property Rights - Patent – Abbreviated New Drug Application
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Terminated:Mar 21, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Represented By
Jeremy A. Tigan
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By
Jeremy A. Tigan
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Jeremy A. Tigan
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sandoz Inc.
Represented By
Dominick T. Gattuso
Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP
contact info
April Barnard
contact info
Mark H. Remus
contact info
Laura A. Lydigsen
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
20 20 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Fri 03/21 11:30 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,907,756; US 10,105,323.(as)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Decree and Final Judgment
19 19 order Judgment - Consent Fri 03/21 10:30 AM
CONSENT DECREE AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/21/2025. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
18 18 misc Consent Judgment - Proposed Thu 03/20 5:22 PM
PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT -- Consent Decree and Final Judgment -- by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
17 17 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 03/07 10:25 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 2) to March 21, 2025 - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 03/07 11:18 AM
SO ORDERED re17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 2) to March 21, 2025 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH answer due 3/21/2025; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG answer due 3/21/2025; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 3/21/2025). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/7/2025. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
16 16 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 03/04 2:17 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 2) to March 7, 2025 - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 03/04 3:01 PM
SO ORDERED re16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 2) to March 7, 202 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH answer due 3/7/2025; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG answer due 3/7/2025; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 3/7/2025). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/4/2025. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
15 15 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 02/25 12:02 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 2) to March 4, 2025 - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 02/25 1:48 PM
SO ORDERED re15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 2) to March 4, 202 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH answer due 3/4/2025; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG answer due 3/4/2025; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 3/4/2025). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/25/2025. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
14 14 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 02/10 3:05 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 2) to February 25, 2025 - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 02/10 3:15 PM
SO ORDERED re14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 2) to February 25, 2025 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH answer due 2/25/2025; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG answer due 2/25/2025; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 2/25/2025). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/10/2025. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 01/07 11:56 AM
SO ORDERED re13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 2) to February 11, 2025 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH answer due 2/11/2025; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG answer due 2/11/2025; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 2/11/2025). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/7/2025. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
13 13 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 01/06 4:05 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 2) to February 11, 2025 - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Wed 11/20 1:56 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura A. Lydigsen, Mark H. Remus for Sandoz Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Tue 11/19 1:59 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney April Barnard for Sandoz Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
12 12 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Mon 11/18 10:16 AM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Mark H. Remus, Laura A. Lydigsen, and April Barnard. ( re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark H. Remus, Laura A. Lydigsen and April Barnard )( Payment of $ 150, receipt number ADEDC-4550738).(Gattuso, Dominick)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/18 10:14 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark H. Remus, Laura A. Lydigsen and April Barnard - filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Mon 11/18 10:58 AM
SO ORDERED re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark H. Remus, Laura A. Lydigsen and April Barnard filed by Sandoz Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/18/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
10 10 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 11/04 2:09 PM
SO ORDERED re9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 9, 2025 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH answer due 1/9/2025; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG answer due 1/9/2025; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 1/9/2025). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/4/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 11/04 12:40 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 9, 2025 - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
8 8 misc Redacted Document Thu 10/31 2:00 PM
REDACTED VERSION of2 Complaint and Exhibits E, F and L by Sandoz Inc.(Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 10/31/2024 (dlw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit E,
Att: 2 Exhibit F,
Att: 3 Exhibit L
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/30 11:34 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
order SO ORDERED Fri 10/25 8:20 AM
SO ORDERED re1 MOTION to Seal - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and the Complaint and Exhibits E, F & L may be filed under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that redacted versions of these documents shall be filed no later than 10/31/2024. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/25/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Thu 10/24 4:19 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sandoz AG, Other Affiliate Sandoz Group AG for Sandoz Inc. filed by Sandoz Inc.. (oam)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Thu 10/24 4:15 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,907,756; 10,105,323. (oam)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc ANDA Form Thu 10/24 4:14 PM
Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 05/20/2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: 06/4/2029 & 06/07/2029. (oam)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Exhibit to a Document Thu 10/24 4:11 PM
EXHIBIT In Support of D.I.2 Complaint filed by Sandoz Inc.(oam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B,
Att: 2 Exhibit C,
Att: 3 Exhibit D,
Att: 4 Exhibit G,
Att: 5 Exhibit H,
Att: 6 Exhibit I,
Att: 7 Exhibit J,
Att: 8 Exhibit K,
Att: 9 Exhibit M,
Att: 10 Exhibit N,
Att: 11 Exhibit O,
Att: 12 Exhibit P,
Att: 13 Exhibit Q,
Att: 14 Exhibit R,
Att: 15 Exhibit S
3 3 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 10/24 4:03 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (oam)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 10/24 4:01 PM
[SEALED] COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4531692.) - filed by Sandoz Inc..(oam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit E,
Att: 2 Exhibit F,
Att: 3 Exhibit L,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 8 pgs motion Seal Thu 10/24 3:57 PM
MOTION to File Complaint and Exhibits Under Seal - filed by Sandoz Inc.(oam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
service No Summons Issued Thu 10/24 4:21 PM
No Summons Issued. (oam)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 10/24 4:31 PM
Remark: Exit Electronic Copies to Duty Judge MN. (oam)
Related: [-]