New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:24-cv-10028
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
MARK FROST
Represented By
JONATHAN EDWARD KOHUT
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
HEATHER WEINE BROCHIN
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
Defendant
JAMES RATLIFF
Represented By
JONATHAN EDWARD KOHUT
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
HEATHER WEINE BROCHIN
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NYP, LLC
Represented By
VITO A. GAGLIARDI, JR.
Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Tue 05/06 11:12 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tyler Bowman, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GAGLIARDI, VITO)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Tue 05/06 11:11 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John Duffey, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GAGLIARDI, VITO)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Pro Hac Vice request Tue 05/06 2:28 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by VITO GAGLIARDI on 5/6/2025 cannot be processed until pro hac counsel has been admitted and the application fee paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. This message is for informational purposes only. (mj)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/05 7:48 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the parties request that they be permitted an additional 31 days (until June 2, 2025) to determine whether Mr. Ratliff's proposed counterclaim remains necessary and, if so, whether it can be filed with Plaintiff's consent pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/5/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
21 21 misc Letter Fri 05/02 3:39 PM
Letter from Plaintiff with consent of Defendants. (GAGLIARDI, VITO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
20 20 order Text Order Thu 04/24 10:57 AM
TEXT ORDER The Court has reviewed the letter at D.E. 19. The parties shall continue to meet and confer regarding the matter raised therein and shall file an updated letter on or before May 2, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/24/2025. (mp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
19 19 misc Letter Thu 04/17 3:51 PM
Letter from Plaintiff with consent of Defendants. (GAGLIARDI, VITO)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/09 10:53 AM
LETTER ORDER granting request to revise the April 4 Order to reflect the deadline for the parties to exchange Initial Disclosures, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26, as April 25, 2025 rather than the current date reflected in the April 4 Order (i.e., April 7, 2025). Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/7/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/09 10:48 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JOHN T. DUFFEY, ESQ., and TYLER J. BOWMAN, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/7/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Fri 04/04 4:33 PM
Letter from Defendants with consent of Plaintiff. (BROCHIN, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/04 9:25 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/25/2025 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Amended Pleadings due by 6/20/2025. Fact Discovery due by 9/26/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 6/20/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/4/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Fri 04/04 9:10 AM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/4/2025. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 04/03 11:49 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/31/2025. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
13 13 discov Joint Discovery Plan Mon 03/24 4:13 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by NYP, LLC.(GAGLIARDI, VITO)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Letter Mon 03/24 4:12 PM
Letter from Vito A. Gagliardi, Jr.. (GAGLIARDI, VITO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/27 8:22 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NYP, LLC.(GAGLIARDI, VITO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Vito A. Gagliardi, Jr.,
Att: 2 Certification of John T. Duffey,
Att: 3 Certification of Tyler J. Bowman,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/27 11:09 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pm, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
10 10 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 02/11 11:37 AM
TEXT ORDER - The telephonic initial R.16 conference in this matter is adjourned to March 31, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall meet and confer to prepare a Joint Discovery Plan, which shall be filed by no later than March 26, 2025. To join the conference, dial 973-437-5535, access code 766 023 196#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/11/2025. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
9 9 misc Letter Mon 02/10 3:03 PM
Letter from Heather Brochin. (BROCHIN, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
8 8 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 02/05 3:31 PM
TEXT ORDER - The Court will hold a Rule 16 initial scheduling conference, by telephone, on February 28, 2025 at 11:30 AM. The parties shall meet and confer to prepare a Joint Discovery Plan, which shall be filed by February 25, 2025. To join the conference, dial 973-437-5535, access code 766 023 196#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/5/2025. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/06 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN EDWARD KOHUT on behalf of MARK FROST, JAMES RATLIFF (KOHUT, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/04 4:48 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by MARK FROST, JAMES RATLIFF.(BROCHIN, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 11/21 11:34 AM
Answer Due Deadline Update - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MARK FROST has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/4/2024. (and)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 11/21 11:36 AM
Answer Due Deadline Update - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JAMES RATLIFF has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/5/2024. (and)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
5 5 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Wed 11/20 11:43 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to James Ratliff. Attorney HEATHER WEINE BROCHIN for JAMES RATLIFF added. (BROCHIN, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Wed 11/20 11:41 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Mark Frost. Attorney HEATHER WEINE BROCHIN for MARK FROST added. (BROCHIN, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Thu 11/14 5:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mark Frost on 10/30/24, filed by NYP, LLC. (GAGLIARDI, VITO)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 10/25 11:36 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARK FROST, JAMES RATLIFF. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
1 1 32 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/24 3:26 PM
COMPLAINT against MARK FROST, JAMES RATLIFF ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15760946) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NYP, LLC.(GAGLIARDI, VITO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/25 9:22 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (ak, )
Related: [-]