Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Colville
Case #: 2:24-cv-01475
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
McCall B. Chafin
Pennsylvania Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Meghan A. Flowers
Pa Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
DR. LAUREL HARRY
Represented By
Scott A. Bradley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
McCall B. Chafin
Pennsylvania Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Meghan A. Flowers
Pa Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
DR. G. MARISA KELLY-PIMENTEL
PH.D. 232 William Drive
Canonsburg, PA 15317
Represented By
James B. Lieber
Lieber Hammer Huber & Paul, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, January 23, 2025
17 17 order Case Management Order Thu 01/23 9:55 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 2/7/2025; Amended Pleadings due by 2/24/2025; Joinder of Parties due by 2/24/2025; Fact Discovery shall complete by 5/27/2025; Joint Pre Conference Statement due by 5/28/2025; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/2/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. Dial In Information can be found at ECF7 . Details and Deadlines more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/23/25. (cjo)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order Implementing Fed Rule of Evidence 502(d) Thu 01/23 9:51 AM
ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/23/25. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
15 15 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 01/21 2:45 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Flowers, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
14 14 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/06 4:22 PM
ORDER: In light of the Court granting the consented to Motion to Consolidate5 and the filing of an Answer13 , it is hereby ordered that all parties shall confer and submit an updated Rule 26 Meeting Report by January 24, 2025. As discussed during the December 3, 2024 telephonic status conference12 , to the extent any party feels that a status conference to discuss such deadlines is necessary, the same may be requested by way of the parties updated 26(f) Report. It is further ordered that because the parties previously completed ADR, a Stipulation Selecting ADR Process does not need to be filed. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/6/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/30 9:42 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, LAUREL HARRY. (Bradley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
12 12 minutes Telephonic Status Conference Tue 12/03 10:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Colville: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/3/2024. (Court Reporter: none) (cjo)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by McCall B. Chafin on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, LAUREL HARRY. (Chafin, McCall)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Preconference Statement Mon 12/02 3:53 PM
PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT by G. MARISA KELLY-PIMENTEL. (Lieber, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Bradley on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, LAUREL HARRY. (Bradley, Scott)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan A. Flowers on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, LAUREL HARRY. (Flowers, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
7 7 notice Notice - Telephonic Conference (Microsoft Teams) Thu 11/14 12:19 PM
MICROSOFT TEAMS AUDIO CONFERENCING SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES - Every telephonic conference conducted will be via a Microsoft Teams Audio Conferencing call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide a conference ID. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled, you will be instructed to refer back to this notice. This document has a security setting of Case Participants Only, so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (cjo)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 11/14 12:18 PM
ORDER Granting5 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by G. MARISA KELLY-PIMENTEL. Civil Action Number 2:19-cv-481 is hereby consolidated with Civil Action 2:24-cv-1475, the lead case as captioned above. All pleadings, motions and other papers hereafter shall be filed at this case number. It Is Further Ordered that a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 12/3/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. Dial In Information can be found at ECF7 . Joint Pre Conference Statement is due by due by 11/27/2024. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/14/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
5 5 motion Consolidate Cases Thu 11/07 12:01 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by G. MARISA KELLY-PIMENTEL. (Lieber, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 28, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Mon 10/28 11:05 AM
ORDER re 12(b) Motions. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 10/28/24. (cjo)
Related: [-]
3 3 adr Notice of ADR Designation Mon 10/28 11:02 AM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 10/25 10:54 AM
Summons Issued as to LAUREL HARRY, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (dmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
misc QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply) Fri 10/25 8:42 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Incorrect County selected; Incorrect County of residence for Plaintiff. CORRECTION: Attorney is to correct error on Civil Cover Sheet and refile using the Errata event and linking to the Complaint. (dmh) -- ERROR CORRECTED; ATTY NEED NOT FILE ERRATA. Modified text on 10/25/2024. (dmh)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 10/25 8:44 AM
Judge Robert J. Colville added. (dmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Thu 10/24 4:04 PM
COMPLAINT against LAUREL HARRY, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8525382), filed by G. Marisa Kelly-Pimentel, Ph.D.. (Lieber, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons to Def. Pa. DOC,
Att: 3 Summons to Def. Harry