Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Brian E Murphy
Case #: 1:24-cv-12712
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
S-Cel-O, Limited Liability Company
142 Hancock Street
Springfield, MA 01109
Defendant
Teamwork Painting Corp.
142 Hancock Street, Box 1
Springfield, MA 01109
Plaintiff
Debroah Cotter
Represented By
Melissa A. Brennan
Feinberg, Dumont & Brennan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
15 15 order Judgment - Default Tue 03/11 10:27 AM
Judge Brian E. Murphy: DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST S-CEL-O LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND TEAMWORK...It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiff recover from Defendant S-Cel-O, Limited Liability Company, the principal amount of $121,091.44, with attorneys fees and costs in the amount of $2,255.95, interest in the amount of $19,980.09 and liquidated damages in the amount of $24,218.29, for a total judgment of $171,295.45, with interest as provided by law. (BIB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
14 14 respoth Affidavit in Support Tue 02/18 1:31 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to S-Cel-O, Limited Liability Company and Teamwork Painting Corp. .(Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Fees and Costs
13 13 misc Declaration Tue 02/18 1:30 PM
DECLARATION re12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to S-Cel-O, Limited Liability Company and Teamwork Painting Corp. by Debroah Cotter. (Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Default Judgment Tue 02/18 1:26 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to S-Cel-O, Limited Liability Company and Teamwork Painting Corp. by Debroah Cotter.(Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
11 11 misc Mail Returned Thu 01/30 8:45 AM
Mail sent to S-Cel-O, Limited Liability Company Article and Teamwork Painting Corp. Article re8 Standing Order re motions for default judgment,7 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default Returned as Undeliverable. (MBM)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Reassignment Wed 01/29 11:51 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Brian E. Murphy added. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
9 9 misc Copy Mailed Thu 01/16 11:39 AM
Copy re8 Standing Order re motions for default judgment, and7 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default mailed to S-Cel-O, Limited Liability Company and Teamwork Painting Corp. on 1/16/2025. S-Cel-O, Limited Liability Company Article # 7019 2970 0001 7999 2886 Teamwork Painting Corp. Article # 7019 2970 0001 7999 3777 (NMC)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Standing order on motions for default judgment Thu 01/16 10:25 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re7 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default. (NMC)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Notice of Entry of Default by Clerk Thu 01/16 10:23 AM
NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to S-Cel-O, Limited Liability Company and Teamwork Painting Corp. (NMC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
6 6 misc Request for notice of default Wed 01/15 6:07 PM
Request for notice of default by Debroah Cotter . (Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/13 9:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Teamwork Painting Corp. served on 11/8/2024, answer due 11/29/2024. (Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/13 9:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed S-Cel-O, Limited Liability Company served on 11/8/2024, answer due 11/29/2024. (Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 10/29 2:25 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 10/25 11:06 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jessica D. Hedges. (Martin, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/24 5:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Teamwork Painting Corp., S-Cel-O, Limited Liability Company Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10666266 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Deborah Cotter, Administrator of the Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 35 Trust Funds.(Brennan, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G