Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Claude M Hilton
Referred: Lindsey R Vaala
Case #: 1:24-cv-01861
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Terminated:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Khalid Alkhazaali
5840 Cameron Run Terrace Apt. 103
Alexandria, VA 22303
Plaintiff
Abeer Mohameed Ridha Jaafar
5840 Cameron Run Terrace Apt 103
Alexandria, VA 22303
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Terminated: 10/29/2024


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
25 25 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/03 3:37 PM
ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Notify Government and Counterterrorism Authorities of Urgent National Security Concerns is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 4/3/2025. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
24 24 service Certificate of Service Wed 03/12 11:46 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abeer Mohameed Ridha Jaafar re23 NOTICE Regarding Pending Matters Before The Court(Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
23 23 notice Notice (other) Thu 02/06 8:23 AM
NOTICE Regarding Pending Matters Before The Court filed by Abeer Mohameed Ridha Jaafar (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
22 22 misc Waiver of Wed 01/29 10:33 AM
Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re21 Request for Ruling filed by Khalid Alkhazaali. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Wed 01/29 10:31 AM
Request for Ruling re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Khalid Alkhazaali. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
20 20 respm Response to Motion Mon 01/27 7:40 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 Emergency Motion to Notify Government and Counterterrorism Authorities of Urgent National Security Concerns filed by Khalid Alkhazaali. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
19 19 service Affidavit of Service Thu 01/16 3:22 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Abeer Mohameed Ridha Jaafar. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
18 18 misc Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) Fri 01/10 1:21 PM
Exhibit A re17 [CORRECTED] Defendant's Reply to 12 Plaintiff's Response filed by Khalid Alkhazaali. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
17 17 respoth Reply Other Fri 01/10 1:19 PM
[CORRECTED] Defendant's Reply to12 Plaintiff's Response filed by Khalid Alkhazaali.(Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
Friday, January 03, 2025
16 16 misc Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) Fri 01/03 3:26 PM
Exhibit A re15 Defendant's Reply to12 Plaintiff's Response filed by Khalid Alkhazaali. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
15 15 respoth Reply Other Fri 01/03 3:25 PM
Defendant's Reply to12 Plaintiff's Response filed by Khalid Alkhazaali.(Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
Thursday, January 02, 2025
14 14 misc Waiver of Fri 01/03 12:38 PM
Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re13 Emergency Motion to Notify Government and Counterterrorism Authorities of Urgent National Security Concerns filed by Abeer Mohameed Ridha Jaafar (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Fri 01/03 12:36 PM
Emergency Motion to Notify Government and Counterterrorism Authorities of Urgent National Security Concerns filed by Abeer Mohameed Ridha Jaafar.(Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USPS Return Receipt
Thursday, December 12, 2024
12 12 respoth Response Other Mon 12/16 8:16 AM
Response to10 Answer and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Abeer Mohameed Ridha Jaafar. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
11 11 misc Waiver of Mon 11/25 9:27 AM
Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Khalid Alkhazaali (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/25 9:26 AM
Answer and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Khalid Alkhazaali. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/20 8:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abeer Mohameed Ridha Jaafar. Khalid Alkhazaali served on 11/14/2024, answer due 12/5/2024 (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 11/08 7:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Khalid Alkhazaali to be served via certified mail (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
7 7 order Sealed Order Tue 11/05 2:13 PM
ORDER granting2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Abeer Jaafar. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 11/5/2024. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Tue 11/05 2:17 PM
Notice of Correction: Pro se plaintiff notified to provide proposed summons to be issued via USMS. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing Tue 11/05 7:22 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 11/4/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/30 10:02 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Khalid Alkhazaali, filed by Abeer Mohameed Ridha Jaafar. (Dest)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 10/29 5:43 PM
Filing fee: $405, receipt number 100009190 (Dest)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
3 3 motion Pro Se E-Noticing Thu 10/24 2:43 PM
MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing filed by Abeer Jaafar. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/24 2:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Abeer Jaafar. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/24 2:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Unknown Parties, filed by Abeer Jaafar.(Sbro, )
Related: [-]