Nebraska District Court
Case #: 8:24-cr-00169
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 25, 2024 2:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Harold Helm (2)
Defendant
Lindsay Helm (1)
Represented By
A. Michael Bianchi
Bianchi Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher L. Ferretti
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Omaha
contact info

GPO Dec 18 2024
ORDER granting the Defendant's Unopposed 25 Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Pretrial Motions as to Harold Helm (2). Pretrial Motion Deadline set for 1/15/2025. The time between today's date and January 15, 2025, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR)
GPO Feb 20 2025
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Continue Trial as to Harold Helm. Jury Trial, for both defendants, is continued to 5/19/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter Jr. The time between today's date and the anticipated trial is excluded for purposes of computing the limits under the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (MLR)ORDER granting 28 Motion to Continue Trial as to Harold Helm. Jury Trial, for both defendants, is continued to 5/19/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter Jr. The time between today's date and the anticipated trial is excluded for purposes of computing the limits under the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (MLR)
GPO May 08 2025
ORDER as to Lindsay Helm. IT IS ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial (Filing No. 32) is granted as follows: The jury trial, for both defendants, now set for May 19, 2025, is continued to June 23, 2025. In accordance with 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A), the court finds that the ends of justice will be served by granting this continuance and outweigh the interests of the public and the defendants in a speedy trial. Any additional time arising as a result of the granting of this motion, that is, the time between todays date and June 23, 2025, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Failure to grant a continuance would deny counsel the reasonable time necessary for effective preparation, taking into account the exercise of due diligence. 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(6), (7)(A) & (B)(iv). The Court construes the Entry of Appearance (Filing No. 31) as a motion to continue and denies as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (MLR)ORDER as to Lindsay Helm. IT IS ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial (Filing No. 32) is granted as follows: The jury trial, for both defendants, now set for May 19, 2025, is continued to June 23, 2025. In accordance with 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A), the court finds that the ends of justice will be served by granting this continuance and outweigh the interests of the public and the defendants in a speedy trial. Any additional time arising as a result of the granting of this motion, that is, the time between todays date and June 23, 2025, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Failure to grant a continuance would deny counsel the reasonable time necessary for effective preparation, taking into account the exercise of due diligence. 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(6), (7)(A) & (B)(iv). The Court construes the Entry of Appearance (Filing No. 31) as a motion to continue and denies as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (MLR)

Docket last updated: 10/25/2024 4:05 AM CDT
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
1 1 PART 1 OF 2 - INDICTMENT with foreperson's signature redacted pursuant to the E-Government Actas to defendants Lindsay Helm and Harold Helm. (MKR)
Related: [-]
2 2 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE PAGE regarding Indictment1 as to defendants Lindsay Helm and Harold Helm. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(e). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MKR)
Related: [-]
3 3 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendants Lindsay Helm and Harold Helm. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MKR)
Related: [-]
4 4 STRICKEN-Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendants Lindsay Helm and Harold Helm regarding Indictment1 . Initial Appearance set for 11/21/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MKR) Modified on 10/23/2024 to strike per Order 5 (MKR).
Related: [-]
6 6 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Lindsay Helm and Harold Helm regarding Indictment1 . Initial Appearance set for 11/21/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT.(MKR)
Related: [-]