New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00698
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 25, 2024 4:07 AM EDT
Defendant
EUGENE VINSON (1)
Represented By
ALYSSA A. CIMINO
Cimino Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
JAKE A. NASAR
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/25/2024 5:46 AM EDT
Friday, June 09, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to EUGENE VINSON (1). (akw) Modified on 6/26/2023 (sms). [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to EUGENE VINSON for 6/28/2023. (sms) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
3 3 Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus as to EUGENE VINSON, (Initial Appearance scheduled for June 28, 2023 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor.) Signed by Duty Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 6/22/2023. (sms) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
Arrest of EUGENE VINSON. (akw) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor:Initial Appearance as to EUGENE VINSON held on 6/28/2023 (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (akw) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 20 as to EUGENE VINSON: Appointment of Attorney ALYSSA A. CIMINO for EUGENE VINSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/28/2023. (akw) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY ORDER advising of the United States' continuing obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/28/2023. (akw) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to EUGENE VINSON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/28/2023. (akw) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
9 9 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to EUGENE VINSON Time excluded from 6/30/2023 until 8/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/30/2023. (jqb, ) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
10 10 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to EUGENE VINSON Time excluded from 8/25/2023 until 10/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/25/2023. (jqb, ) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
11 11 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to EUGENE VINSON Time excluded from 10/30/2023 until 1/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/30/2023. (jqb, ) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
12 12 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to EUGENE VINSON Time excluded from 1/2/2024 until 3/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/2/2024. (jqb, ) Modified on 1/3/2024 (jqb, ). [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
13 13 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to EUGENE VINSON Time excluded from 3/5/2024 until 5/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/5/2024. (jqb, ) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
14 14 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to EUGENE VINSON Time excluded from 5/8/2024 until 7/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/14/2024. (smf, ) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
Set/Reset Hearings as to EUGENE VINSON : Bond Hearing set for 5/21/2024 at 02:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 4D before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (tjg, ) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor:Bond Hearing as to EUGENE VINSON held on 5/21/2024 (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tjg, ) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to EUGENE VINSON (1) 100,000.00 UNSECURED (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/21/24. (tjg, ) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
17 17 UNSECURED Bond Entered as to EUGENE VINSON in amount of $ 100,000.00, (tjg, ) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
18 18 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to EUGENE VINSON Time excluded from 6/28/2024 until 9/9/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/28/2024. (jqb, ) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
19 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE JAKE A. NASAR appearing for USA. (NASAR, JAKE) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
20 20 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to EUGENE VINSON Time excluded from 9/9/2024 until 11/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/9/2024. (jqb, ) [2:23-mj-10197-MAH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
21 21 INFORMATION as to EUGENE VINSON (1) count(s) 1, 2. (cds)
Related: [-]
22 22 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by EUGENE VINSON (cds )
Related: [-]
23 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan D. Wigenton:Plea Agreement Hearing as to EUGENE VINSON held on 10/22/2024, Plea entered by EUGENE VINSON (1) Guilty Count 1,2., ( Sentencing set for 3/5/2025 at 03:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 5C before Judge Susan D. Wigenton.) Unless otherwise advised by this Court, hard copies of any submissions to be reviewed by the Judge for sentencing must be submitted directly to Chambers in accordance with procedures set forth in Standing Order #20-1. Counsel should be advised that any submissions received after the deadline may not be considered. Further, counsel will be precluded from orally arguing issues set forth in any untimely submissions. (Court Reporter/Recorder Joanne Sekella (973-776-7753).) (cds)
Related: [-]
24 24 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to EUGENE VINSON. (cds)
Related: [-]
25 25 PLEA AGREEMENT as to EUGENE VINSON. (cds)
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER TO RESCIND CONDITIONS OF BAIL as to EUGENE VINSON. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 10/22/2024. (msd)(USM Notified)
Related: [-]