Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-01401
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 25, 2024 2:41 AM CDT
Defendant
Juan Pacheco Araiza (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 10/25/2024 4:21 AM CDT
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Juan Pacheco Araiza (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 10/23/2024 at 09:35 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (akp5)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Juan Pacheco Araiza, filed. (akp5)
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on October 22, 2024 at 03:52 PM as to Juan Pacheco Araiza. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (akp5)
Related: [-]