Indiana Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00921
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 25, 2024 3:50 AM EDT
Defendant
BRYAN K. ATKINS (1)
Represented By
Dominic David Martin
Indiana Federal Community Defenders
contact info
Miscellaneous
USM (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Carolyn Anne Haney
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/25/2024 5:41 AM EDT
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
2 2 ARREST Warrant Returned by US Marshal. Service of Warrant EXECUTED on 10/18/2024 in case as to BRYAN K. ATKINS (1). Electronic Notice to USM-W.(TPS)
Related: [-]
6 6 Notice of Readiness for Initial Appearance by USA as to BRYAN K. ATKINS (1) (TPS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
1 1 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump: as to BRYAN K. ATKINS (1). Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to BRYAN K. ATKINS (1) held on 10/22/2024. Financial affidavit approved. Counsel appointed. Charges and rights were read and explained. Defendant waived his right to an identity hearing. Government moved for the defendant to remain in custody pending transport to the Southern District of Illinois. Defendant consented to detention pending transport and requested that the detention hearing and any other hearings to which he is entitled be held in the charging district. Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshals pending removal to the Southern District of Illinois. Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump. (TPS)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing by BRYAN K. ATKINS (1) (TPS)
Related: [-]
5 5 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to BRYAN K. ATKINS (1). Defendant committed to District of Southern District of Illinois. Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump on 10/23/2024. Electronic Notice to USM-C.(TPS)
Related: [-]