Texas Western District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00190
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 25, 2024 2:46 AM CDT
Defendant
Corey Okeith Wallace (1)
Represented By
Sandra Lynne Stewart
Sandy Stewart, Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Mahoney
Doj-Usao
contact info
Brandi Young
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Dec 20 2024
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Corey Okeith Wallace. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (slt)
GPO Jan 06 2025
ORDER accepting re 23 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Corey Okeith Wallace. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)

Docket last updated: 10/25/2024 4:10 AM CDT
Thursday, October 10, 2024
Arrest of Corey Okeith Wallace (jb3) [7:24-mj-00286-RCG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin as to Corey Okeith Wallace. (jb3) [7:24-mj-00286-RCG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald C. Griffin:Initial Appearance as to Corey Okeith Wallace held on 10/16/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR - Midland.) (jb3) [7:24-mj-00286-RCG]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Sandra Lynne Stewart for Corey Okeith Wallace appointed. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) [7:24-mj-00286-RCG]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Corey Okeith Wallace. (jb3) [7:24-mj-00286-RCG]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Corey Okeith Wallace Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 10/23/2024 09:30 AM in Midland before Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) [7:24-mj-00286-RCG]
Related: [-]
6 6 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Corey Okeith Wallace. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) [7:24-mj-00286-RCG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
All parties shall comply with the[LINK:Standing Orders] for the Midland/Odessa Division. Parties can review the standing orders by clicking the included hyperlink as to Corey Okeith Wallace (jb3)
Related: [-]
7 7 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Corey Okeith Wallace (1) count(s) 1. (slt)
Related: [-] dacted Version
9 9 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Corey Okeith Wallace (slt)
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David B. Fanin:Arraignment as to Corey Okeith Wallace (1) Count 1. Plea of not guilty entered on 10/23/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Detention Hearing as to Corey Okeith Wallace held on 10/23/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR Midland.) (slt) Modified Judge on 10/24/2024 (slt).
Related: [-]
11 11 EXHIBIT LIST as to Corey Okeith Wallace. (slt) (slt).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/24/2024) Pretrial Report
12 12 ORDER GRANTING4 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. as to Corey Okeith Wallace (1). Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (slt)
Related: [-]