Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-20432
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 25, 2024 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Alex Manuel Delgado (1)
Represented By
Micki Bloom
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Noticing FPD-MIA
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nadya Z. Cheatham
contact info
Kseniya Smychkouskaya
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/25/2024 7:37 AM EDT
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
1 1 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Alex Manuel Delgado. (kan)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal as to Alex Manuel Delgado (1). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 9/25/2024. See attached document for full details. (kan)
Related: [-]
3 3 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Alex Manuel Delgado (1) count(s) 1 and FORFEITURE. (kan) (kan).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/27/2024) Restricted Unredacted Indictment