New Jersey District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00613
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 25, 2024 4:20 AM EDT
Defendant
TRI ANH TIEU (1)
Represented By
STANLEY O. KING
Javerbaum Wurgaft Hicks Kahn Wikstrom & Sinins, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ANDY TRAN (2)
Represented By
MARC NEFF
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
JEFFREY BRIAN BENDER
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/25/2024 6:08 AM EDT
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
Notice of Allocation and Assignment as to TRI ANH TIEU and ANDY TRAN. (Judge Christine P. O'Hearn - Camden) (js)
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to TRI ANH TIEU (1) count 1, ANDY TRAN (2) count 1. (js)
Related: [-]
2 2 Order to Seal Case as to TRI ANH TIEU, ANDY TRAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 9/25/2024. (js)
Related: [-]