Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01053
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mark Williams
Represented By
Mark Williams
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
12 12 order Continue Hearing (Order) Thu 04/17 3:37 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Trial Docket Call Related [+] Signed on 4/17/25. Hearing scheduled for 8/20/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 4 Order,11 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
11 11 motion Continue Hearing Wed 04/16 2:45 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On April 23, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Katherine Elizabeth Clark of Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray (Clark, Katherine)
Related: [-] 4 Order
Att: 1 Draft Order
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/02 1:19 PM
Summons Service Executed on Mark Williams 4/2/2025 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/02 1:19 PM
Summons Service Executed on Mark Williams 4/2/2025 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
8 8 court Summons Issued (AP) Fri 03/28 11:36 AM
Summons Re-Issued on Mark Williams Answer Due 4/28/2025. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
7 7 miscap Request for Issuance of Summons (PF) Thu 03/27 1:59 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 4:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Fri 11/08 2:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Monday, October 28, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 10/28 3:56 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 10/28/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/25 3:35 PM
Summons Service Executed on Mark Williams 10/25/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Fri 10/25 10:31 AM
Summons Issued on Mark Williams Answer Due 11/25/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/24 2:53 PM
Adversary case 24-01053 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Secs. 544, 547, 548 and 550 by Dwayne M. Murray against Mark Williams. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover sheet