Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01057
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Matthews CFO Services, LLC
Represented By
Matthews CFO Services, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 04/16 6:08 PM
Order Granting Joint Ex Parte Motion to Continue Docket Call for Trial and Related Deadlines. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 4/16/25 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 4 Order,9 Order Continuing Trial and Pre-Trial Conference,13 Motion to Continue Trial filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray, Defendant Matthews CFO Services, LLC
13 13 motion Continue Trial (Motion) (AP) Wed 04/16 11:09 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial on Joint Ex Parte Motion to Continue Docket Call for Trial and Related Deadlines Filed by Matthews CFO Services, LLC, Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)9 Order Continuing Trial and Pre-Trial Conference) (Caplinger, Christopher
court Hearing (Document) Stricken (AP) Wed 04/16 10:37 AM
4/23/2025 Hearing Removed - Order entered 2/10/2025 Continuing Trial Docket Call to June 18, 2025 at 2:00 pm Related [+]. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 4 Order,8 Motion to Continue Trial filed by Trustee Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray,9 Order Continuing Trial and Pre-Trial Conference
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
12 12 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 02/26 4:56 PM
Summons Service Executed on Acrisure Trade Credit, Through Jack Crowley 2/26/2025 . (Derbes, Eric)
Related: [-]
11 11 miscap Deposition Subpoena (PF) Wed 02/26 4:41 PM
Deposition Subpoena issued to Acrisure Trade Credit, Through Jack Crowley scheduled for 4/02/2025 at 10:00am. Filed by Matthews CFO Services, LLC (Derbes, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 01/10 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)9 Order Continuing Trial and Pre-Trial Conference) Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
9 9 order Continuing Trial and Pre-Trial Conference (Order) Tue 01/07 12:29 PM
Order Continuing Trial. Signed on January 7, 2025 Related [+] Trial scheduled for 6/18/2025 at 02:00 PM at U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. Discovery due by 4/17/2025. (Sylvester, Kenisha)
Related: [-] 4 Order,8 Motion to Continue Trial filed by Trustee Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray
Monday, January 06, 2025
8 8 motion Continue Trial (Motion) (AP) Mon 01/06 2:49 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial on Joint Ex Parte Motion to Continue Docket Call for Trial and Related Deadlines Filed by Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Monday, December 30, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint (AP) Mon 12/30 11:31 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Matthews CFO Services, LLC (Derbes, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 4:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Fri 11/08 2:49 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Monday, October 28, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 10/28 4:19 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 10/28/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/25 3:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on Matthews CFO Services, LLC 10/25/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Fri 10/25 10:41 AM
Summons Issued on Matthews CFO Services, LLC Answer Due 11/25/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 10/25 2:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 24-01057 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A8371196, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Thursday, October 24, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/24 4:30 PM
Adversary case 24-01057 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Secs. 544, 548 and 550 by Dwayne M. Murray against Matthews CFO Services, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover sheet