Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:24-bk-70206

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott W Everett
Case #: 7:24-ap-07002
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
United States Department of Education
400 Maryland Ave. SW
Washington, DC 20202
Represented By
United States Department of Education
contact info
Plaintiff
Marlina Mitsue Jedro
3604 Garfield St.
Wichita Falls, TX 76308
Represented By
Luke A Homen
Luke Homen Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
20 20 motion Continue Tue 05/13 10:07 AM
Joint Motion to continue hearing on Related [+] Motion to extend stay for an additional 90 days filed by Defendant United States Department of Education (Parker, Tami)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 18, 2025
19 19 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 04/18 11:19 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order granting motion to continue hearing. it is further ORDERED that this case is STAYED until May 21, 2025. (related document16 ) (related documents Complaint) Entered on 4/16/2025. (Blanco, J.)
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
18 18 order Continue Wed 04/16 3:48 PM
Order granting motion to continue hearing. it is further ORDERED that this case is STAYED until May 21, 2025. Related [+] Entered on 4/16/2025. (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 16 Complaint
Thursday, March 13, 2025
17 17 court Clerk's correspondence Thu 03/13 5:22 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for defendant. Related [+] Responses due by 3/27/2025. (Hyden, Kara)
Related: [-] 16 Agreed Motion to continue hearing on (related documents1 Complaint) Motion to extend stay for an additional 90 days filed by Defendant United States Department of Education filed by Defendant United States Department of Education
Thursday, February 20, 2025
16 16 motion Continue Thu 02/20 2:23 PM
Agreed Motion to continue hearing on Related [+] Motion to extend stay for an additional 90 days filed by Defendant United States Department of Education (Theiss, Dawn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, December 07, 2024
15 15 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sat 12/07 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order granting motion to stay and continue proceedings (related document13 ) FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED until February 20, 2025. Entered on 12/5/2024.
Thursday, December 05, 2024
14 14 order Continue Thu 12/05 8:56 AM
Order granting motion to stay and continue proceedings Related [+] FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED until February 20, 2025. Entered on 12/5/2024. (Dugan, Sue)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, November 22, 2024
13 13 motion Continue Fri 11/22 10:17 AM
Motion to continue hearing on Related [+] filed by Defendant United States Department of Education (Theiss, Dawn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, November 09, 2024
12 12 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sat 11/09 11:20 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order granting motion for leave to proceed without local counsel (related document9 ) Entered on 11/7/2024.
Thursday, November 07, 2024
11 11 court Hearing held Thu 11/07 3:32 PM
Status Conference held on 11/7/2024 re:1 Complaint by Marlina Mitsue Jedro against United States Department of Education. (STATUS CONFERENCE HELD) (Ferrufino, Sara)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Leave (Not for Appeal use) Thu 11/07 2:42 PM
Order granting motion for leave to proceed without local counsel Related [+] Entered on 11/7/2024. (Dugan, Sue)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, November 01, 2024
9 9 motion Leave (Not for Appeal use) Fri 11/01 2:19 PM
Motion for leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Plaintiff Marlina Mitsue Jedro Objections due by 11/22/2024. (Homen, Luke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Thursday, October 31, 2024
8 8 cmp Summons service executed Thu 10/31 2:02 PM
Summons service executed on United States Department of Education 10/31/2024 (Homen, Luke)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of hearing Thu 10/31 10:30 AM
Notice of hearing filed by Plaintiff Marlina Mitsue Jedro Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 11/7/2024 at 09:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/everett for6 , Status Conference to be held on 11/7/2024 at 09:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/everett. (Homen, Luke)
Related: [-] 6 Summons service executed
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
6 6 cmp Summons service executed Tue 10/29 3:40 PM
Summons service executed on United States Department of Education 10/29/2024 (Homen, Luke)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons service executed Tue 10/29 11:17 AM
Summons service executed on United States Department of Education 10/29/2024 (Homen, Luke)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Mon 10/28 10:43 AM
Summons service executed on Marlina Mitsue Jedro 10/28/2024 (Homen, Luke)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Fri 10/25 10:37 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call/Trial date set for 2/13/2025 at 09:00 AM Wichita Falls Live Dkt, Rm 222. Entered on 10/25/2024 (Bergreen, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marlina Mitsue Jedro
2 2 court Summons issued Fri 10/25 10:34 AM
Summons issued on United States Department of Education Answer Due 11/25/2024 (Bergreen, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/24 4:32 PM
Adversary case 24-07002 Complaint by Marlina Mitsue Jedro against United States Department of Education. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan). (Homen, Luke)
Related: [-]