California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:24-cv-02316
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2024
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court - West Justice Center, 30-02024-01422883
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:27 AM PDT
Defendant
Carmichael Lynch, Inc.
Represented By
Mackenzie Mullin
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Juan Rehl-Garcia
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Joshua A. Rodine
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Represented By
Juan Rehl-Garcia
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Interpublic Group of Companies Inc.
Represented By
Mackenzie Mullin
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Juan Rehl-Garcia
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Joshua A. Rodine
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Otto Kyriakidis
Represented By
Gary S Brotman
Marquee Law Group Apc
contact info
Farshid Shawn Azizollahi
Marquee Law Group Apc
contact info
Nancy Goodes
Marquee Law Group, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
24 24 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 04/02 10:29 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance,23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G-123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
23 23 notice Appearance Wed 03/26 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mackenzie Mullin on behalf of Defendants Carmichael Lynch, Inc., Interpublic Group of Companies Inc. (Attorney Mackenzie Mullin added to party Carmichael Lynch, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mackenzie Mullin added to party Interpublic Group of Companies Inc.(pty:dft))(Mullin, Mackenzie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
22 22 order Protective Order Wed 03/19 10:51 AM
JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott re Stipulation for Protective Order21 . [See document for details.] (san)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
21 21 stip Protective Order Tue 03/18 12:30 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Carmichael Lynch, Inc., Interpublic Group of Companies Inc..(Rodine, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 03, 2025
20 20 14 pgs order Order Mon 02/03 1:04 PM
ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Mon 02/03 12:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f), VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for February 6, 2025, and sets the following schedule: ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2025., Discovery cut-off 10/21/2025., Motions due by 12/11/2025., Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/30/2025., Jury Trial set for 3/10/2026 at 08:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter., Motion set for hearing on 2/19/2026 at 08:30 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter., Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2026 at 08:30 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 01/29 12:38 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Juan Rehl-Garcia counsel for Defendants Carmichael Lynch, Inc., Interpublic Group of Companies Inc., Does. Juan Rehl-Garcia is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Carmichael Lynch Inc. and The Interpublic Group of Companies Inc.. (Attorney Juan Rehl-Garcia added to party Does(pty:dft)) Related [+]
Related: [-] hl-Garcia, Juan
Friday, January 03, 2025
17 17 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 01/03 10:56 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant Carmichael Lynch, Inc... Related [+]
Related: [-] hl-Garcia, Juan
Monday, November 18, 2024
16 16 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 11/18 9:06 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court has reviewed and considered Defendants Request to have Co-Counsel Appear in Lieu of Lead Counsel at Scheduling Conference, (Dkt.15 (Application)), filed by Defendants Carmichael Lynch, Inc. and The Interpublic Group of Companies Inc. (Defendants). The Application request[s] to have co-counsel, Juan Rehl-Garcia, appear in lieu of lead trial counsel, Joshua A. Rodine, at the Scheduling Conference scheduled for February 6, 2025, in Courtroom 10D. Based on the state of the record, as applied to the applicable law, the court finds the Application makes a sufficient showing for the relief requested. Accordingly, the Application is GRANTED and Juan Rehl-Garcia may appear in lieu of lead trial counsel, Joshua A. Rodine, at the Scheduling Conference scheduled for February 6, 2025, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 10D. Separately, the court notes that the Application did not have an accompanying proposed order filed with it. Counsel are reminded that [A] separate proposed order shall be lodged with any motion or application requiring an order of the Court, pursuant to L.R. 52-4.1. L.R. 7-20. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
15 15 misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 11/14 5:39 PM
Defendants' Request to Have Co-Counsel Appear In Lieu of Lead Counsel At Scheduling Conference re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only13 Related [+]
Related: [-] hl-Garcia, Juan
Thursday, October 31, 2024
14 14 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 10/31 9:06 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Carmichael Lynch, Inc., Interpublic Group of Companies Inc., re Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89),10 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form9 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only12 served on October 30, 2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] hl-Garcia, Juan
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 10/30 1:48 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2025 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel shall review complete order for details. (mku)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 10/30 10:52 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter (mku)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/28 1:46 PM
Notice filed by Defendants Carmichael Lynch, Inc., Interpublic Group of Companies Inc.. Notice of Designation of Joshua A. Rodine As Lead Counsel Related [+]
Related: [-] hl-Garcia, Juan
10 10 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Mon 10/28 9:59 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:24-cv-02316 FWS(KESx). (rn)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 10/28 8:59 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 10/28 8:58 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 10/28 8:57 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
6 6 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 10/25 11:49 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Carmichael Lynch, Inc., a Minnesota corporation, Interpublic Group of Companies Inc., a Delaware corporation, Related [+]
Related: [-] hl-Garcia, Juan
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/25 11:44 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Carmichael Lynch, Inc., a Minnesota corporation, Interpublic Group of Companies Inc., a Delaware corporation identifying The Interpublic Group of Companies Inc. as Corporate Parent. Related [+]
Related: [-] hl-Garcia, Juan
4 4 misc Declaration Fri 10/25 11:38 AM
DECLARATION of Emily Moe re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendants Carmichael Lynch, Inc., a Minnesota corporation, Interpublic Group of Companies Inc., a Delaware corporation. Related [+]
Related: [-] hl-Garcia, Juan
3 3 misc Declaration Fri 10/25 11:35 AM
DECLARATION of Juan Rehl-Garcia re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendants Carmichael Lynch, Inc., a Minnesota corporation, Interpublic Group of Companies Inc., a Delaware corporation. Related [+]
Related: [-] hl-Garcia, Juan
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 10/25 11:30 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Carmichael Lynch, Inc., a Minnesota corporation, Interpublic Group of Companies Inc., a Delaware corporation. Related [+]
Related: [-] hl-Garcia, Juan
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 10/25 11:28 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court - West Justice Center, case number 30-2024 01422883 Receipt No: ACACDC-38467562 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendants Interpublic Group of Companies Inc., a Delaware corporation, Carmichael Lynch, Inc., a Minnesota corporation. (Attorney Juan Rehl-Garcia added to party Carmichael Lynch, Inc., a Minnesota corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Juan Rehl-Garcia added to party Interpublic Group of Companies Inc., a Delaware corporation(pty:dft)) Related [+]
Related: [-] hl-Garcia, Juan
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 10/28 9:09 AM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Carmichael Lynch, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Interpublic Group of Companies Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Otto Kyriakidis. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/29/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO DECLARATION of Juan Rehl-Garcia3 ). (et)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 10/28 9:12 AM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Carmichael Lynch, Inc., Interpublic Group of Companies Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 2 TO DECLARATION of Juan Rehl-Garcia3 ). (et)
Related: [-]