Florida Southern District Court
Judge:James I Cohn
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:24-cv-62005
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2024
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Adobe, Inc.
a Delaware Corporation 1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
Frank Cruz-Alvarez
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
David J. Reis
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Kaitlin Robinson
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Mediator
Ellen L. Leesfield
Plaintiff
Robert Winstead
Represented By
Keith Michael Stern
Law Office Of Keith M. Stern, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 16, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 01/16 1:38 PM
ORDER CLOSING CASE: re22 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case and DENY any pending motions as MOOT. Closing Case. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 1/16/2025. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Thu 01/16 12:02 PM
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Robert Winstead (Stern, Keith) Modified Text on 1/16/2025 (wce)
Related: [-]
21 21 adr Mediation Report Thu 01/16 10:32 AM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT held before Mediator Ellen Leesfield. Prepared by: Ellen Leesfield. Filed by Ellen L. Leesfield. Disposition: Settled in full. Mediation held/partially held via video-conference. (Leesfield, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/20 12:52 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. All pro hac vice motions have been referred to the undersigned for appropriate disposition. ECF No.6 at 2. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Attorney Kaitlin A. Robinson, of the law firm of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP, may appear and participate in this action as co-counsel on behalf of Defendant Adobe, Inc. Further, the Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Attorney Robinson at kaitlin.robinson@arnoldporter.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 12/20/2024. (sd01)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Thu 12/19 2:34 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kaitlin A. Robinson. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18066241 by Adobe, Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2025. (Cruz-Alvarez, Frank)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
18 18 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Wed 12/18 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Ellen L. Leesfield as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 1/15/2025 at 10:00 a.m.. (Stern, Keith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
17 17 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 12/17 10:37 AM
ORDER REQUIRING MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 12/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/16 4:38 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/28/2025 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Calendar Call set for 7/24/2025 before Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 12/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 12/16 4:30 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Scheduling Conference held on 12/16/2024. Scheduling Order and Mediation Order to be entered separately. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Frank Cruz-Alvarez, David J. Reis, and Keith Michael Stern. (Digital Audio Zoom Meeting ID 160 501 0820) (ar2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Thu 12/12 9:01 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint Scheduling Report) by Adobe, Inc. (Cruz-Alvarez, Frank)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
13 13 order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Thu 12/05 6:16 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER REGARDING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference scheduled for Monday, December 16, 2024 will commence at 3:30 PM . This is only a time change. All other terms of the10 Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 12/5/2024. (lbe)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/05 4:43 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING11 Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. All pro hac vice motions have been referred to the undersigned for appropriate disposition. ECF No.6 at 2. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Attorney David J. Reis, of the law firm of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP, may appear and participate in this action as co-counsel on behalf of Defendant Adobe, Inc. Further, the Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Attorney Reis at david.reis@arnoldporter.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 12/5/2024. (lbe)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Thu 12/05 8:53 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David J. Reis. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18028882 by Adobe, Inc.. Responses due by 12/19/2024. (Cruz-Alvarez, Frank)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Fri 11/22 11:36 AM
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2024 at 3:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/18 3:58 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Adobe, Inc. (Cruz-Alvarez, Frank)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/18 3:52 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Adobe, Inc.. Attorney Frank Cruz-Alvarez added to party Adobe, Inc.(pty:dft). (Cruz-Alvarez, Frank)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 11/01 12:36 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robert Winstead. Adobe, Inc. served on 10/28/2024, response/answer due 11/18/2024. (Stern, Keith)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
6 6 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 10/28 9:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 7/28/2025 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 7/24/2025 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn.), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 10/28/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 10/25 4:00 PM
Summons Issued as to Adobe, Inc. (wce)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/25 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Robert Winstead (Stern, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s) Proposed Summons to Adobe, Inc.
3 3 order Clerk's Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES) Fri 10/25 3:46 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) will not be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the corrected summons attached. (wce)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 10/25 3:45 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/25 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Adobe, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17936515, filed by Robert Winstead.(Stern, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A: Winstead Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 2 Exhibit B: EEOC RTS Notice Winstead,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summon(s) Adobe, Inc.