California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:24-cv-02317
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2024
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02024-01417162-CU-
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:28 AM PDT
Defendant
Reliance, Inc.
Represented By
Sarah E Christenson
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Carlos Bacio
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Lalith Ratnayake
Represented By
Jonathan James Haderlein
Haderlein And Kouyoumdjian LLP
contact info
Krikor Kouyoumdjian
Haderlein And Kouyoumdjian LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
19 19 order Protective Order Thu 03/20 2:00 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER18 by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (kh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
18 18 stip Protective Order Wed 03/19 4:51 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Reliance, Inc..(Bacio, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 26, 2024
17 17 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 12/26 7:43 AM
ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/23 4:07 PM
MINUTES SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to FRCP 26(f), VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2025, and sets the following schedule: Jury Trial set for 4/7/2026 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 3/19/2026 at 8:30 AM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties: N/A. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 9/18/2025. Last Date to Hear Motions: 12/18/2025. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 1/8/2026. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 2/26/2026. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 3/5/2026. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 12/23 2:27 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Reliance, Inc... (Bacio, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
14 14 misc Declaration Fri 11/15 10:47 AM
DECLARATION of Carlos Bacio re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 Re Filing of Notice of Removal and Notice to Orange Cuperior Court and Service of Notice of Removal on Plaintiff filed by Defendant Reliance, Inc.. (Bacio, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 10/30 1:46 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2025 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel shall review complete order for details. (mku)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 10/30 10:58 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter (mku)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 10/29 2:56 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 10/29 2:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 10/29 2:55 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
8 8 misc For Judicial Notice Fri 10/25 3:12 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant Reliance, Inc.. (Bacio, Carlos)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Declaration Fri 10/25 3:11 PM
DECLARATION of Katie Sales re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Reliance, Inc.. (Bacio, Carlos)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Declaration Fri 10/25 3:10 PM
DECLARATION of Carlos Bacio re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Reliance, Inc.. (Bacio, Carlos)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Related Case(s) Fri 10/25 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Reliance, Inc.. (Bacio, Carlos)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/25 3:06 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Reliance, Inc. (Bacio, Carlos)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 10/25 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Reliance, Inc., (Bacio, Carlos)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 10/25 3:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Reliance, Inc.. (Bacio, Carlos)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 10/25 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2024 01417162-CU-WT-NJC Receipt No: ACACDC-38470625 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Reliance, Inc.. (Attorney Carlos Bacio added to party Reliance, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bacio, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Summons,
Att: 2 State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 State Court Answer
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 10/29 2:37 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Reliance, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Lalith Ratnayake. [FILED IN STATE COURT 8/1/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 10/29 2:57 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Reliance, Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 10/24/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]