Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Bridget Meehan Brennan
Case #: 1:24-cv-01868
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2024
Terminated:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Locus Management, LLC
Defendant
Locus Solutions, LLC
Defendant
Joseph Concannon
Defendant
FTI Consulting, Inc.
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 650
Dallas, TX 75201
Defendant
Locus Holdings, LLC
Represented By
David R. Mayo
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff - Cleveland
contact info
Elliot M. Smith
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Staub
Represented By
Peter C. Mapley
Sobel, Wade & Mapley
contact info
Michael R. Fortney
Fortney Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Judgment Thu 04/10 3:57 PM
Order of Dismissal: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc.22 ). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/10/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 04/10 9:45 AM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Timothy Staub. (Fortney, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 04/09 10:12 AM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Timothy Staub. (Fortney, Michael)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Wed 04/09 11:22 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document]: Status Conference set for 4/9/2025 at 02:30 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of email of the telephone number for the conference. The parties shall dial into the Court's bridge line at least five minutes prior to hearing. (T,A)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 04/09 3:16 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] : A telephonic status conference was held on 4/9/2025 before Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan. Attorney Michael Fortney participated on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys Elliot Smith and David Mayo participated on behalf of Defendant Locus Holdings, LLC. The Court received clarification as to the notice of dismissal. A revised notice will be submitted. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 5 minutes. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Dismissal Mon 04/07 4:38 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Timothy Staub. (Fortney, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
order Order Wed 04/02 1:40 PM
Order [non-document]: The Court granted Plaintiff a one-week extension of the previous stated deadline to address Defendants' filing on supplemental jurisdiction. (Docs. 17-19.) The revised deadline to respond was 3/20/2025. The parties emailed Chambers on 3/20/2025 raising the issue of another extension of this deadline. No motion requesting such an extension was filed or granted. Plaintiff has until noon on 4/4/2025 to file a response. Failure to comply with this deadline will result in the Court taking Defendants' supplemental briefing under advisement without any response from Plaintiff. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/2/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for leave Thu 03/13 3:39 PM
Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave. (Doc.18 ). Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 3/13/25.(T,A)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Leave Thu 03/13 3:10 PM
Motion for leave filed by Plaintiff Timothy Staub. (Fortney, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Leave Thu 03/13 3:08 PM
Motion for leave filed by Plaintiff Timothy Staub. (Fortney, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
16 16 oth_ans Brief Fri 03/07 1:42 PM
Brief Regarding Supplemental Jurisdiction filed by Locus Holdings, LLC. (Mayo, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
15 15 oth_doc SEALED DOCUMENT Wed 03/05 11:21 AM
SEALED Document: Arbitration Award filed by Timothy Staub. Related document(s)9 . (Fortney, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
14 14 order Initial Order - Judge Brennan Tue 03/04 2:37 PM
Initial Standing Order. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 3/4/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
13 13 resp Response Tue 03/04 10:31 AM
Response to7 Motion for temporary restraining order, and Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Locus Holdings, LLC.(Mayo, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Contribution Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Strict Foreclosure Agreement
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 03/04 8:35 AM
Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. Judge David A. Ruiz terminated. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Tue 03/04 10:05 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] A telephonic Status Conference is set for 3/4/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of email of the telephone number for the conference. The parties shall dial into the Court's bridge line at least five minutes prior to hearing. (T,A)
Related: [-]
order Minute Order _ Status Conference Tue 03/04 4:39 PM
Minute Order [non-document]: A telephonic status conference was held on 3/4/2025 before Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan. Attorney Michael Fortney participated on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys David Mayo and Elliot Smith participated on behalf of Defendant Locus Holdings, LLC. During the call, the issue of whether the Court has authority to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the claims presented in the verified complaint was raised. All parties acknowledged the Application to Confirm Arbitration Award invoked 9 U.S.C. § 9, with Defendant's counsel questioning whether the Court has the authority to also exercise jurisdiction over their client for Ohio law claims related to fraudulent conveyances. Plaintiff's counsel requested expedited briefing on the issue, and the Court agreed. Defendant Locus Holdings, LLC is to file a brief addressing supplemental jurisdiction no later than 3/7/2025, at 5:00 p.m. EST. Plaintiff is to file any responsive brief no later than 3/13/2025, at 5:00 p.m. EST. Page limit for these submissions: 10 pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 3/4/25. (Court reporter: None) Time: 25 minutes (T,A)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order reassigning case Mon 03/03 8:47 PM
Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another District Judge. Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/3/2025. (G,CA)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 03/03 4:41 PM
Attorney Appearance by David R. Mayo and Elliot M. Smith filed by on behalf of Locus Holdings, LLC. (Mayo, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 03/03 1:51 PM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Joseph Concannon, FTI Consulting, Inc., Locus Holdings, LLC; Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon Locus Management, LLC, Locus Solutions, LLC. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
9 9 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Mon 03/03 10:12 AM
Marginal Entry Order . The Court grants Plaintiff's request in R.1 to file referenced Arbitration Award under seal. This Sealing Order, however, may be revoked upon further consideration and notice to the parties. Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/3/2025. (G,CA)
Related: [-]
oth_doc Request to Clerk for Refund of Erroneous or Duplicate On-line Filing Fee Payment Mon 03/03 9:06 AM
Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Paid complaint filing fee twice. Receipt #: AOHNDC-12980813, filed by Timothy Staub. Related document(s)6 . (Fortney, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 03/03 10:26 AM
Order [non-document]: Telephone Status Conference set for Tuesday, March 4, 2025 at 12:15 PM before Judge David A. Ruiz, regarding Plaintiff's7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. As no defendant has entered an appearance, Plaintiff's counsel shall forward this notice to defendants and their counsel, if any. Conferencing instructions to be emailed to counsel. Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/3/2025. (G,CA)
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 03/03 11:59 AM
Order [non-document]: Based upon Plaintiff's8 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Peter Mapley and adding attorney Michael R. Fortney, attorney Peter C. Mapley is termed as counsel for plaintiff. Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/3/2025. (G,CA)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
8 8 notice Attorney Substitution (atty event) Fri 02/28 7:54 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Peter Mapley and adding attorney Michael R. Fortney filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Fortney, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 02/28 7:50 PM
Motion for temporary restraining order filed by Plaintiff Timothy Staub. (Fortney, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Complaint Fri 02/28 7:47 PM
Complaint with jury demand against All Plaintiffs. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12980813.. Filed by Timothy Staub. (Fortney, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons to Locus Management,
Att: 3 Summons Summons to Locus Solutions,
Att: 4 Summons Summons to Locus Holdings,
Att: 5 Summons Summons to FTI Consulting,
Att: 6 Summons Summons to Joseph Concannon,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Locus Ingredients assignment,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Locus Fermentation Solutions assignment,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Locus Animal Nutrition assignment,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Locus Wellness assignment,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Locus Consumer Brands assignment,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Locus Mining Solutions assignment,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Locus Performance Ingredients assignment,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Locus Management dissolution,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Locus Solutions dissolution
Thursday, December 05, 2024
5 5 motion Default Judgment (Motion for) Thu 12/05 1:26 PM
Motion for default judgment entry by clerk filed by Plaintiff Timothy Staub.(Mapley, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Peter C. Mapley,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certified Mail Green Card,
Att: 3 Errata Certified Mail Green Card
Thursday, November 14, 2024
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Thu 11/14 12:30 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Locus Solutions, LLC on 11/9/2024, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Timothy Staub. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Thu 11/14 12:27 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Locus Management, LLC on 11/9/2024, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Timothy Staub. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
oth_evt Service by Clerk Thu 11/07 3:34 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Locus Solutions, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 0188 6836 10. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Service by Clerk Thu 11/07 3:35 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Locus Management, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 0188 6836 37. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 10/28 8:41 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Locus Management, LLC, Locus Solutions, LLC. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
Friday, October 25, 2024
1 1 4 pgs cmp Application to Vacate/Confirm Arbitration Award Fri 10/25 3:54 PM
Application to Confirm Arbitration Award with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12802379.. Filed by Timothy Staub. (Mapley, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit Arbitration Demand,
Att: 5 Exhibit Appointment of Arbitrator
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 10/28 8:36 AM
Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 10/28 8:36 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (F,AW)
Related: [-]