Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Charles Esque Fleming
Referred: James E Grimes Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-01869
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 4:39 AM EDT
Defendant
William J. Berryman
Represented By
Tracey L. Turnbull
Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur - Cleveland
contact info
Ryan M. Hodinka
Balch & Bingham - Birmingham
contact info
M. Jefferson Starling, III
Balch & Bingham - Birmingham
contact info
Defendant
Eric Kropp
107 County Road 232
Niota, TN 37826
Defendant
Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC
Represented By
Tracey L. Turnbull
Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur - Cleveland
contact info
Ryan M. Hodinka
Balch & Bingham - Birmingham
contact info
M. Jefferson Starling, III
Balch & Bingham - Birmingham
contact info
Defendant
Carey Riddle
Represented By
Tracey L. Turnbull
Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur - Cleveland
contact info
Ryan M. Hodinka
Balch & Bingham - Birmingham
contact info
M. Jefferson Starling, III
Balch & Bingham - Birmingham
contact info
Plaintiff
Mazzella Holding Company, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen S. Zashin
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Corey N. Thrush
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Lisa A. Kainec
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
David P. Frantz
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Ami J. Patel
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc.
2100 Aerospace Parkway
Cleveland, OH 44142
Represented By
Stephen S. Zashin
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Corey N. Thrush
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Lisa A. Kainec
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
David P. Frantz
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Ami J. Patel
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Robert Joseph Ivey
Terminated: 03/18/2025
12327 South Pointe Drive
Moundville, AL 35474

GPO Feb 24 2025
Report and Recommendation that the Court grant in part Mazzella's motion to enforce the parties' settlement agreement, Docs. 22, 25, to the extent that Kropp has breached the parties' settlement agreement, and that the Court deny in part Mazzella's motion to the extent that Mazzella is not entitled to attorneys' fees for seeking to enforce the agreement. (Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 03/10/2025) Referral terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 02/24/2025. (M,MT)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
44 44 motion Leave Wed 05/07 3:00 PM
Motion for leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Response to Plaintiff's Request for Discovery Contained in their Motion for Sanctions Against Eric Kopp filed by William J. Berryman, Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC, Carey Riddle. Related document(s)41 . (Turnbull, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
43 43 oth_doc SEALED DOCUMENT Fri 04/25 3:38 PM
SEALED Document: Declaration of Jeremy R. Dinsmore filed by Mazzella Holding Company, Inc., Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc.. Related document(s)24 ,41 .(Frantz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. - Dinsmore Resume,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. - N1D 4.9.2025 Email to Kropp,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. - 4.9.2025 Email with Attachment_Redacted,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. - Kropp 4.11.2025 Email to N1D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E. - N1D 4.14.2025 Email to Kropp,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. - N1D 4.17.2025 Email to Kropp with Attachment
42 42 oth_doc SEALED DOCUMENT Fri 04/25 3:32 PM
SEALED Document: Declaration of David Frantz filed by Mazzella Holding Company, Inc., Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc.. Related document(s)24 ,41 .(Frantz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. D. Frantz 4 4-2025 email to Kropp,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. 4 9-2025 email from Kropp,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. D. Frantz 4 9-2025 email to Kropp Redacted,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. 4 11-2025 email exchange between N1 Discovery and Kropp,
Att: 5 Exhibit E. D. Frantz 4 11-2025 email to Kropp,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. 4 14-2025 email from N1 Discovery,
Att: 7 Exhibit G. A. Patel 4 14-2025 email to Kropp,
Att: 8 Exhibit H. 4 17-2025 email and attachment from N1 Discovery,
Att: 9 Exhibit I. D. Frantz 4 22-2025 email to Kropp,
Att: 10 Exhibit J. 4 15-2025 email from Kropps Gmail account
41 41 motion SEALED MOTION Fri 04/25 3:22 PM
SEALED Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Eric Kropp for Violation of Court's April 4, 2025 Order 24 ,40 filed by Mazzella Holding Company, Inc., Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc.. Related document(s)24 ,40 .(Frantz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Eric Kropp for Violation of Court's April 4, 2025 Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Eric Kropp for violation of Court's April 4, 2025 Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
40 40 minutes ~Util - Document Sealed - This Filing ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Fri 04/04 8:49 AM
SEALED Order Adopting35 Report and Recommendation. See Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 4/4/2025. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
39 39 1 pgs order Order on Motion to dismiss party Order on Motion to withdraw document Tue 03/18 3:03 PM
Order granting Plaintiff's38 Motion to dismiss party Robert Joseph Ivey and Motion to withdraw document. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 3/18/2025.(S,SR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Tue 03/18 3:15 PM
Copy of39 Order on Motion to dismiss party, Order on Motion to withdraw document mailed to Robert Joseph Ivey at 12327 South Pointe Drive Moundville, AL 35474 on 3/18/2025. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
38 38 motion Dismiss Party Withdraw Document Mon 03/17 12:44 PM
Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendant Robert Ivey , Joint Motion to withdraw document ECF# 37 Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Mazzella Holding Company, Inc., Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc.. Related document(s)37 .(Frantz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Dismissing Plaintiffs' Claims Against Defendant Robert Ivey with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 21
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 03/11 3:07 PM
Stipulated Notice of Dismissal of Party Robert Joseph Ivey Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with Prejudice filed by All Plaintiffs. (Patel, Ami) Modified text to note party dismissed on 3/11/2025 (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
36 36 oth_ans Objection to Report and Recommendation Mon 03/10 3:57 PM
Objection to Report and Recommendation filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)35 . (Frantz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Granting In Part Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Agreement with Defendant Kropp [ECF 22, 25]
Monday, February 24, 2025
35 35 minutes ~Util - Terminate Referral Report and Recommendation Mon 02/24 2:43 PM
Report and Recommendation that the Court grant in part Mazzella's motion to enforce the parties' settlement agreement, Docs.22 ,25 , to the extent that Kropp has breached the parties' settlement agreement, and that the Court deny in part Mazzella's motion to the extent that Mazzella is not entitled to attorneys' fees for seeking to enforce the agreement. (Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 03/10/2025) Referral terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 02/24/2025. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Mon 02/24 2:45 PM
Copy of35 Report and Recommendation mailed to Eric Kropp 107 County Road 232 Niota, TN 37826 snf Robert Joseph Ivey 12327 South Pointe Drive Moundville, AL 35474. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
34 34 oth_ans Brief Thu 02/06 3:49 PM
Brief Addressing Choice-of-Law Analysis Applicable to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Agreement with Defendant Eric Kropp filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)32 . (Frantz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Matthew Mazzella
Friday, January 31, 2025
33 33 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/31 2:15 PM
Answer to1 Complaint filed by Eric Kropp.(W,Jo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, January 30, 2025
32 32 2 pgs order Order Thu 01/30 3:18 PM
Order: Within seven days of this order, Mazzella is to file a brief containing a choice-of-law analysis, citing relevant legal authority, and explaining what state law should apply to its Motion to enforce settlement agreement. See Order for further details. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 01/30/2025. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Thu 01/30 3:19 PM
Copy of32 Order mailed to Eric Kropp at 107 County Road 232, Niota, TN 37826 and Robert Joseph Ivey at 12327 South Pointe Moundville, Al 35474. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
31 31 resp Reply Mon 01/13 4:30 PM
Reply in support of7 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by William J. Berryman, Carey Riddle, Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC. (Turnbull, Tracey)
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 01/13 10:08 AM
Order [non-document] Defendant Kropp's response to Plaintiff Mazzella's Motion to enforce settlement agreement, Docs.22 ,25 , is due on January 27, 2025. The Court may schedule a hearing on the Motion. Kropp is advised to consult the Guide for Pro Se Litigants found on the Court's website at https://www.ohnd.uscourts.gov/pro-se-information. If Kropp doesnt submit a response to Mazzellas Motion, the Court will consider the motion unopposed. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 01/13/2025. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Mon 01/13 10:09 AM
Copy of 01/13/2025 non document Order mailed to Eric Kropp at 107 County Road 232, Niota, TN 37826 and Robert Joseph Ivey at 12327 South Pointe Moundville, Al 35474. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
30 30 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 01/10 1:52 PM
Plaintiffs' Notice of Service Upon Defendant Eric Kropp filed by All Plaintiffs.(Frantz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Process Server,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - FedEx of Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - FedEx of ECF# 22 & 23,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - FedEx of ECF# 2-25
29 29 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 01/10 1:39 PM
Plaintiffs' Notice of Defendant Robert Ivey's Consent to Email Service filed by All Plaintiffs.(Frantz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email Consent
28 28 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/10 11:38 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC waiver sent on 11/6/2024, answer due 1/6/2025 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/10 11:36 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. William J. Berryman waiver sent on 11/6/2024, answer due 1/6/2025 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/10 11:34 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Carey Riddle waiver sent on 11/6/2024, answer due 1/6/2025 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
order Order Tue 01/07 10:09 AM
Order: [non-document] Plaintiff Mazzella indicates that it served pro se Defendant Kropp with its Motion to enforce settlement via email. See Doc.22 -1, at 6; Doc.25 , at 6. Mazzella has not indicated that Kropp consented in writing to service via email. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 5(b)(2)(E). By January 10, Mazzella must show that Kropp consented in writing to service via email or it must state that it served Kropp in compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 01/07/2025. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Tue 01/07 10:15 AM
Copy of 01/07/2025 non document Order mailed to Eric Kropp at 107 County Road 232, Niota, TN 37826 and Robert Joseph Ivey at 12327 South Pointe Moundville, Al 35474. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
25 25 oth_doc SEALED DOCUMENT Mon 01/06 1:48 PM
SEALED Document: Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Enforce Agreement with Defendant Eric Kropp filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)24 ,22 .(Frantz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Confidential Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Emails and Attachments
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for leave Mon 01/06 11:48 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for leave to file under seal Related [+]. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 1/6/2025. (S,SR)
Related: [-] 23
order Order of Referral Mon 01/06 11:51 AM
Order [non-document] referring case to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. for report and recommendation on22 Motion to enforce Agreement with Defendant Eric Kropp . Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 1/6/2025. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
23 23 motion Leave Tue 12/31 1:39 PM
Motion for leave to File Under Seal Unredacted Memorandum and Related Exhibits in Support of Motion to Enforce Agreement with Defendant Eric Kropp filed by Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc., Mazzella Holding Company, Inc.. Related document(s)22 . (Frantz, David)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Enforce Tue 12/31 12:33 PM
Motion to enforce Agreement with Defendant Eric Kropp filed by Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc., Mazzella Holding Company, Inc..(Frantz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Enforce Agreement with Defendant Eric Kropp,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Counsel
Monday, December 30, 2024
21 21 oth_ans Brief Mon 12/30 5:14 PM
Brief in Opposition to Defendants Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC, Josh Berryman and Carey Riddle's Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)7 . (Frantz, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
20 20 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Stipulation & Order Wed 12/11 11:51 AM
Stipulation & Order . Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/11/2024. Related Document13 . (S,SR)
Related: [-]
minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Wed 12/11 11:56 AM
Order [non-document] granting the18 Joint Motion to stay Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint until December 30, 2024. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/11/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 11/27 12:16 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Frantz, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
18 18 motion Stay Tue 11/26 3:34 PM
Joint Motion to stay Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc., Mazzella Holding Company, Inc.. Related document(s)7 . (Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
17 17 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Fri 11/15 9:24 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC. (Turnbull, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 11/08 2:02 PM
Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction As to Defendants Noble Crane, Berryman and Riddle filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)2 .(Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Fri 11/08 12:21 PM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Videoconference with counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendants Berryman, Riddle, and Noble Crane set for today at 3:30 p.m. Zoom instructions will be provided by email. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
minutes ~Util - Terminate Referral Order Fri 11/08 2:17 PM
Order: [non-document] The Plaintiffs have resolved their Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Doc.2 , as to all Defendants. See Doc.13 (Defendant Ivey), Doc.15 (Defendant Kropp), and Doc.16 (Defendants Berryman, Riddle, and Noble Crane). So the videoconference set for today is canceled. The referral is terminated. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 11/08/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 11/07 5:02 PM
Plaintiffs' Notice Advising Court Regarding Plaintiffs' Pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendant Eric Kropp filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)2 .(Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
14 14 motion Extension (other) Wed 11/06 4:57 PM
Motion for extension of time until November 7th, 2024 to Advise Court re Plaintiff's Pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendant Eric Kropp filed by Mazzella Holding Company, Inc., Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc.. Related document(s)2 . (Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Wed 11/06 5:03 PM
Order [non-document] granting Doc.14 Motion for Extension of Time until November 7th, 2024 to Advise Court re Plaintiff's Pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendant Eric Kropp. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 11/6/2024.(W,Su)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
13 13 7 pgs motion Order Tue 11/05 2:03 PM
Joint Motion for Proposed Stipulated Order between Plaintiffs and Defendant Ivey filed by Mazzella Holding Company, Inc., Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc..(Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Restricted Customers_Redacted
12 12 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Tue 11/05 1:18 PM
Notice of Service of Summons in a Civil Action to Robert Joseph Ivey filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)6 .(Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
11 11 minutes Status Conference Thu 10/31 4:37 PM
Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. Status Conference held on 10/31/2024. Plaintiff Mazzella's Motion for TRO as to Defendants Robert Joseph Ivey and Eric Kropp. Present were Ami J. Patel, counsel for Plaintiff; Tracey L. Turnbull and M. Jefferson Starling, III, counsel for Defendants William J. Berryman, Carey Riddle, and Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC1; and Defendants Robert Joseph Ivey and Eric Kropp, who each appeared pro se. The parties presented argument on Mazzellas Motion and the matter has been taken under advisement. The Court gave the parties the opportunity to come to an agreement on a proposed TRO order, and they have until Tuesday, November 5, to do so. Mazzella's counsel will notify the Court as to the outcome of their discussions. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 10/31/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
10 10 oth_doc Proposed Order Thu 10/31 1:42 PM
Proposed Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/31 9:56 AM
Motion for attorney M. Jefferson Starling, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12810238, filed by William J. Berryman, Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC, Carey Riddle.(Turnbull, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/31 9:53 AM
Motion for attorney Ryan M. Hodinka to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12810186, filed by William J. Berryman, Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC, Carey Riddle.(Turnbull, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration
order Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Thu 10/31 11:43 AM
Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 10/31/2024 with Ami J. Patel, counsel for Plaintiff Mazzella, and Tracey L. Turnbull, Ryan M. Hodinka, and M. Jefferson Starling, III, counsel for Defendants William J. Berryman, Carey Riddle, and Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC. Counsel advised that they have reached an agreement as to the TRO between Mazzella and Berryman, Riddle, and Noble Crane. As a result, Mazzella will be filing a motion to withdraw this portion of its TRO motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 10/31/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Thu 10/31 3:12 PM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Ryan M. Hodinka for William J. Berryman, Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC, and Carey Riddle. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Related [+]. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 10/31/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-] 8
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Thu 10/31 3:15 PM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney M. Jefferson Starling for William J. Berryman, Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC, and Carey Riddle. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Related [+]. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 10/31/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 10/30 5:03 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by William J. Berryman, Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC, Carey Riddle. Related document(s)1 .(Turnbull, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Wed 10/30 11:12 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Status Conference: The Defendants' responses to Plaintiff Mazzella's Motion for temporary restraining order, Doc.2 , are due today, October 30, by 5:00 p.m. E.S.T. Mazzella's reply is due tomorrow, October 31, by 12:00 noon E.S.T. The Court will hold a hearing via videoconference on October 31 at 2:00 p.m. E.S.T. Instructions for the videoconference will be emailed to counsel and as-yet unrepresented parties using the addresses that Mazzella provided. Mazzella and the represented defendants should make all reasonable efforts to ensure that Ivey and Kropp are aware of this Order and the hearing. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 10/30/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
6 6 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 10/28 9:08 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon William J. Berryman, Robert Joseph Ivey, Eric Kropp, Carey Riddle, Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC, and Noble Crane & Rigging, LLC c/o Registered Agent Northwest Registered Agent Service, Inc. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 10/28 8:43 AM
Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 10/28 8:44 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
order Order of Referral Mon 10/28 9:39 AM
Order [non-document] referring2 Motion for temporary restraining order to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. for report and recommendation. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 10/28/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
5 5 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Fri 10/25 4:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Fri 10/25 4:36 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 10/25 4:34 PM
Certificate of Counsel Pursuant to Federal Civil Rule 65 filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)2 .(Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 10/25 4:27 PM
Motion for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Mazzella Holding Company, Inc., Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc.. Related document(s)1 .(Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/25 4:15 PM
Complaint against All Plaintiffs. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12802385.. Filed by Mazzella Lifting Technologies, Inc., Mazzella Holding Company, Inc.. (Patel, Ami)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Berryman Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Riddle Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Ivey Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D - Kropp Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E - E. Kropp Cease and Desist,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. F - R. Ivey Cease and Desist,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. G - E. Kropp 2nd Cease and Desist,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. H - Letter to Noble Crane and Berryman,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. I - R. Ivey 2nd Cease and Desist,
Att: 10 Summons Summons - W. Berryman,
Att: 11 Summons Summons - C. Riddle,
Att: 12 Summons Summons - R. Ivey,
Att: 13 Summons Summons - E. Kropp,
Att: 14 Summons Summons - Noble Crane & Rigging,
Att: 15 Summons Summons - Noble Crane & Rigging co Northwest Registered Agent & W. Davis,
Att: 16 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet