Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Case #: 4:24-cv-00964
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:601 Age Discrimination in Employment Act
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant
MICARAMY LOGISTICS & TRUCKING, LLC
Represented By
Joslyn Roxann Smith
Law Office Of J.R. Smith
contact info
Plaintiff
RUSS BOWERS
Represented By
Kell Ascher Simon
The Law Offices Of Kell A Simon Pllc - Austin
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, February 14, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Fri 02/14 4:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2026 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2025. Discovery due by 7/28/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 3/24/2025. Jury instructions due by 1/28/2026. Mediation Completion due by 8/13/2025. Designation of Mediator due by 7/14/2025. Motions due by 8/6/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/12/2026. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/14/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 02/14 11:27 AM
NOTICE: The Rule 16 management conference set for 2/26/2025 is cancelled. The Court will issue a scheduling order. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
15 15 misc Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, Protective or Discovery Order Mon 02/10 12:49 PM
JOINT Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by RUSS BOWERS . (Simon, Kell)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Status Report Mon 02/10 12:47 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by RUSS BOWERS. (Simon, Kell)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/30 11:47 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICARAMY LOGISTICS & TRUCKING, LLC, filed by RUSS BOWERS.(Simon, Kell)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Leave to File Document Thu 01/30 11:46 AM
OPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by RUSS BOWERS.(Simon, Kell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/29 7:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RUSS BOWERS .(Simon, Kell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Amend/Correct Wed 01/29 7:21 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by RUSS BOWERS.(Simon, Kell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
9 9 motion Dismiss Wed 01/15 9:06 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by MICARAMY LOGISTICS & TRUCKING, LLC.(Smith, Joslyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit/Declaration Affidavit in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, January 09, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/09 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joslyn Roxann Smith on behalf of MICARAMY LOGISTICS & TRUCKING, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10608717. (Smith, Joslyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
7 7 11 pgs order Order Governing Proceedings Fri 01/03 1:22 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/10/2025. Rule 16 Management Conference SET for 2/26/2025 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/3/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 01/02 10:33 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (jmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
6 6 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 12/31 11:11 AM
FIRST Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by MICARAMY LOGISTICS & TRUCKING LLC (Smith, Joslyn)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/31 11:07 AM
Original ANSWER to1 Complaint by MICARAMY LOGISTICS & TRUCKING LLC.(Smith, Joslyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 11/06 10:40 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RUSS BOWERS. MICARAMY LOGISTICS & TRUCKING LLC waiver sent on 11/1/2024, answer due 12/31/2024. (Simon, Kell)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 10/25 6:07 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by RUSS BOWERS (Simon, Kell)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/25 6:02 PM
COMPLAINT against MICARAMY LOGISTICS & TRUCKING LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10442312.), filed by RUSS BOWERS.(Simon, Kell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/28 8:23 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 10/28 8:23 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc)
Related: [-]